Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSierra Club v. Department of the Interior
DistrictNorthern District of California
CityOakland
Case Number4:2019cv01492
Date Filed2019-03-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore
PlaintiffSierra Club
Case DescriptionThe Sierra Club submitted FOIA requests to the Department of the Interior for records concerning the influence of third parties on the Department's policies. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after it failed to respond satisfactorily, the Sierra Club filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of the Interior
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-221COMPLAINT against Department of the Interior ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13194719.). Filed bySierra Club. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Eberle, Louisa) (Filed on 3/22/2019) (Entered: 03/22/2019)
2019-03-222Proposed Summons. (Eberle, Louisa) (Filed on 3/22/2019) (Entered: 03/22/2019)
2019-03-223Certificate of Interested Entities by Sierra Club (Eberle, Louisa) (Filed on 3/22/2019) (Entered: 03/22/2019)
2019-03-224Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/5/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2019) (Entered: 03/22/2019)
2019-03-225Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/18/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/25/2019 01:30 PM. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2019) (Entered: 03/25/2019)
2019-03-256**DISREGARD, INCORRECT PDF ATTACHED** Summons Issued as to United States Department of the Interior. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2019) Modified on 3/25/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/25/2019)
2019-03-257Summons Issued as to United States Department of the Interior. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2019) (Entered: 03/25/2019)
2019-04-058SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sierra Club. United States Department of the Interior served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Eberle, Louisa) (Filed on 4/5/2019) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
2019-04-089MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13240446.) filed by Sierra Club. (Smith, Joshua) (Filed on 4/8/2019) (Entered: 04/08/2019)
2019-04-0910Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Joshua Douglas Smith. (ivaS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2019) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-04-0911CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 4/23/2019. (ivaS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2019) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-04-1012CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sierra Club.. (Eberle, Louisa) (Filed on 4/10/2019) (Entered: 04/10/2019)
2019-04-2913ANSWER to 1 Complaint by United States Department of the Interior. (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 4/29/2019) Modified on 4/30/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/29/2019)
2019-04-3014CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 5/14/2019. (ivaS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019) (Entered: 04/30/2019)
2019-05-1415CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States Department of the Interior.. (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 5/14/2019) (Entered: 05/14/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar