Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGooch v. Office of the Director of National Intelligence
DistrictNorthern District of Georgia
CityAtlanta
Case Number1:2019cv01310
Date Filed2019-03-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Totenberg
PlaintiffMilton Gooch, III
Case DescriptionMilton Gooch submitted a FOIA request to the Office of the Director of National Intelligence for records concerning himself. Gooch had recently filed a complaint with the Inspector General for the Intelligence Community. The agency responded to Gooch's FOIA request by providing a copy of his complaint. Gooch filed an administrative appeal of the decision, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Gooch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantOffice of the Director of National Intelligence Washington, D.C. 20511
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-221COMPLAINT filed by Milton Gooch, III. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number GAN100111238) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 03/25/2019)
2019-03-222Summons Issued as to Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (eop) (Entered: 03/25/2019)
2019-03-223Summons Issued as to U. S. Attorney General. (eop) (Entered: 03/25/2019)
2019-03-224Summons Issued as to U. S. Attorney. (eop) (Entered: 03/25/2019)
2019-03-275Return of Service Executed by Milton Gooch, III. (Attachments: # 1 Return of Service Attorney General, # 2 Return of Service DNI)(bnp) (Entered: 03/28/2019)
2019-04-016STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE AMY TOTENBERG. You are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto. To request to file material under seal, the Parties should follow the mechanism described in Section II(J) of Appendix H to the Court's Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 4/1/2019. (bnp) (Entered: 04/01/2019)
2019-04-01Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Milton Gooch, III re 6 Order. (bnp) (Entered: 04/01/2019)
2019-04-057NOTICE Of Filing Certificate of Compliance by Milton Gooch, III (bnp) (Entered: 04/08/2019)
2019-04-248ANSWER to 1 COMPLAINT by Office of the Director of National Intelligence. Discovery ends on 9/23/2019.(Manship, Flora) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 04/24/2019)
2019-04-249CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 6 Order, Certificate of Compliance with Standing Order by Flora Manship on behalf of Office of the Director of National Intelligence (Manship, Flora) (Entered: 04/24/2019)
2019-05-2410Initial Disclosures by Office of the Director of National Intelligence.(Manship, Flora) (Entered: 05/24/2019)
2019-05-2411Defendant's PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Manship, Flora) Modified on 5/24/2019 to edit text (bnp). (Entered: 05/24/2019)
2019-06-0312Initial Disclosures filed by Milton Gooch, III.(aaq) (Entered: 06/04/2019)
2019-06-0313Plaintiff's PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Milton Gooch, III. (aaq) (Entered: 06/04/2019)
2019-06-2814ORDER re 11 , 13 Preliminary Report and Discovery Plans. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file a Notice with the Court WITHIN FOURTEEN DAYS OF THIS ORDER: (1) identifying specifically what documents or additional information Plaintiff contends Defendant has improperly withheld from production under FOIA; and (2) explaining in detail the basis for Plaintiff's contention that Defendant acted in bad faith in conducting an inadequate search for records in response to Plaintiff's FOIA request. Plaintiff is further DIRECTED to provide supporting documentation in Plaintiff's possession that would substantiate Plaintiff's contention that additional documents exist responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 6/28/2019. (bnp) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-06-28Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Milton Gooch, III re 14 Order. (bnp) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-07-1215RESPONSE to 14 Order Regarding Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan filed by Milton Gooch, III. (bnp) (Entered: 07/15/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar