Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-03-26 | 1 | COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6023425) filed by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Civil Process Clerk, # 3 Summons DOI, # 4 Summons OSMRE, # 5 Summons U.S. AG)(McKay, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/26/2019) |
2019-03-26 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (McKay, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/26/2019) |
2019-03-27 | | Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/27/2019) |
2019-03-27 | 3 | SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/27/2019) |
2019-04-08 | 4 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/2/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/2/2019. (McKay, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/08/2019) |
2019-04-08 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/03/2019. (McKay, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/08/2019) |
2019-04-08 | 6 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 4/1/2019 (McKay, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/08/2019) |
2019-04-08 | 7 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT served on 4/1/2019 (McKay, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/08/2019) |
2019-04-09 | 8 | NOTICE of Appearance by Alexa Marie Carreno on behalf of WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (Carreno, Alexa) (Entered: 04/09/2019) |
2019-04-26 | 9 | NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua L. Rogers on behalf of All Defendants (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 04/26/2019) |
2019-04-30 | 10 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 04/30/2019) |
2019-05-02 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's complaint by June 3, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/2/2019. (lccrc1) (Entered: 05/02/2019) |
2019-05-30 | 11 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 05/30/2019) |
2019-05-31 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's complaint by June 17, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/31/2019. (lccrc1) (Entered: 05/31/2019) |
2019-06-14 | 12 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 06/14/2019) |
2019-06-18 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall respond to the complaint by July 17, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/18/2019. (lccrc1) (Entered: 06/18/2019) |
2019-06-24 | | Case directly reassigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. Judge Christopher R. Cooper is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 06/24/2019) |
2019-07-15 | 13 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 07/15/2019) |
2019-07-16 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of Defendants' 13 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and that the Answer deadline is extended to August 16, 2019. It is further ORDERED that the Parties shall confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before August 30, 2019. The Joint Status Report shall address: (1) the status of the Plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to the Plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force , 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on July 16, 2019. (lccjn1) (Entered: 07/16/2019) |
2019-08-16 | 14 | Joint MOTION to Stay by OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 08/16/2019) |
2019-08-19 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the Parties' 14 Joint Motion to Stay, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties' Motion is GRANTED and this matter is stayed until September 16, 2019. It is further ORDERED that the Parties shall submit a Joint Status Report by September 16, 2019. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on August 19, 2019. (lccjn1) (Entered: 08/19/2019) |
2019-08-19 | | Case Stayed. Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 9/16/2019. (zcdw) (Entered: 08/19/2019) |
2019-09-18 | 15 | ERRATA by OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 09/18/2019) |
2019-09-18 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 09/18/2019) |
2019-09-18 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the Parties' 16 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report on or before October 16, 2019. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on September 18, 2019. (lccjn1) (Entered: 09/18/2019) |
2019-09-18 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 10/16/2019. (zcdw) (Entered: 09/18/2019) |
2019-10-16 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 10/16/2019) |
2019-10-17 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the Parties' 17 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report on or before October 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on October 17, 2019. (lccjn1) (Entered: 10/17/2019) |
2019-10-17 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 10/30/2019. (zcdw) (Entered: 10/17/2019) |
2019-10-17 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 10/30/2019. (zcdw) (Entered: 10/22/2019) |
2019-10-30 | 18 | STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT, JOINT by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Carreno, Alexa) (Entered: 10/30/2019) |
2019-11-01 | 19 | ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on November 1, 2019. (lccjn1) Modified text on 11/4/2019 (zcdw). (Entered: 11/01/2019) |
Hide Docket Events |