Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAmericans for Immigrant Justice, Inc. v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictSouthern District of Florida
CityMiami
Case Number1:2019cv21156
Date Filed2019-03-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Jose E. Martinez
PlaintiffAmericans for Immigrant Justice, Inc.
Case DescriptionAmericans for Immigrant Justice submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning the relationship between U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement and the Atlantic Shores Hospital in Fort Lauderdale. AI Justice also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, AI Justice filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
DefendantUnited States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-261COMPLAINT against Americans for Immigrant Justice, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11505344, filed by Americans for Immigrant Justice, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summon(s), # 3 Summon(s), # 4 Summon(s), # 5 Summon(s), # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit)(Norris, Allison) (Entered: 03/26/2019)
2019-03-262Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pcs) (Entered: 03/26/2019)
2019-03-263Summons Issued as to United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (pcs) (Entered: 03/26/2019)
2019-03-274Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 3/27/2019. See attached document for full details. (dq) (Entered: 03/27/2019)
2019-04-265Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to 1 Complaint, by United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Attorney Carlos Javier Raurell added to party United States Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Carlos Javier Raurell added to party United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement(pty:dft). (Raurell, Carlos) (Entered: 04/26/2019)
2019-04-296ORDER granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document United States Department of Homeland Security. Answer due 7/1/2019; United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Answer due 7/1/2019. Re: 1 Complaint, filed by Americans for Immigrant Justice, Inc.. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 4/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs) (Entered: 04/29/2019)
2019-07-017Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to 1 Complaint, by United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Raurell, Carlos) (Entered: 07/01/2019)
2019-07-038ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document United States Department of Homeland Security. Answer due 7/22/2019; United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Answer due 7/22/2019. Re: 1 Complaint, filed by Americans for Immigrant Justice, Inc.. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 7/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs) (Entered: 07/03/2019)
2019-07-239Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Answer One Day Late by United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Raurell, Carlos) (Entered: 07/23/2019)
2019-07-2310ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Raurell, Carlos) (Entered: 07/23/2019)
2019-07-2511ORDER Granting 9 Motion for Leave to File Answer One Day Late. Clerks Notice: Filer must separately re-file the amended pleading pursuant to Local Rule 15.1, unless otherwise ordered by the Judge . Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 7/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds) (Entered: 07/25/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar