Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00879
Date Filed2019-03-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning a July 2018 meeting between Department of Justice and FBI officials and the Associated Press. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Vaughn index, Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-271COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6025743) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of Justice)(Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 03/27/2019)
2019-03-272LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 03/27/2019)
2019-03-27Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/27/2019)
2019-03-273SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/27/2019)
2019-04-024RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/1/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/1/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/1/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 4/1/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 04/02/2019)
2019-04-295NOTICE of Appearance by Antonia Marie Konkoly on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Konkoly, Antonia) (Entered: 04/29/2019)
2019-04-296Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Konkoly, Antonia) (Entered: 04/29/2019)
2019-05-03MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the defendant's 6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Resond to Plaintiff's Complaint, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiff shall respond to the plaintiff's Complaint on or before May 16, 2019. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on May 3, 2019. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 05/03/2019)
2019-05-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 5/16/2019, (hs) (Entered: 05/03/2019)
2019-05-167ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Konkoly, Antonia) (Entered: 05/16/2019)
2019-05-168GENERAL ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE THE HONORABLE REGGIE B. WALTON. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on May 16, 2019. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 05/16/2019)
2019-05-16MINUTE ORDER. Because the plaintiff pursues this action under the Freedom of Information Act, the initial disclosure requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1)(A) are not implicated and no scheduling conference need be held. See Local Civ. R. 16.3(b)(10). Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit to the Court on or before June 28, 2019, a joint status report, proposing a schedule for the filing of, if any, dispositive motions, oppositions thereto, and replies. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on May 16, 2019. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 05/16/2019)
2019-05-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/28/2019 (hs) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
2019-06-24Case directly reassigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. Judge Reggie B. Walton is no longer assigned to the case. (rj) (Entered: 06/24/2019)
2019-06-289Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Konkoly, Antonia) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-08-0210Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Konkoly, Antonia) (Entered: 08/02/2019)
2019-08-14MINUTE ORDER. In light of the Parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall submit an additional Joint Status Report by September 13, 2019. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on August 14, 2019. (lccjn1) (Entered: 08/14/2019)
2019-08-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties Additional Joint Status Report due by 9/13/2019. (mac) (Entered: 08/15/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar