Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSARRAS v. DOJ
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00861
Date Filed2019-03-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffDONATOS SARRAS
Case DescriptionDonatos Sarras, a federal prisoner, submitted two FOIA requests to the Criminal Division of the Department of Justice for records concerning himself. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Sarras filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantDOJ Criminal Division
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-251COMPLAINT against DOJ ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616097332) filed by DONATOS SARRAS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit)(ztd) (Entered: 03/29/2019)
2019-03-25SUMMONS (3) Issued as to DOJ, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ztd) (Entered: 04/03/2019)
2019-04-192RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/9/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/9/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/12/19., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DOJ served on 4/9/2019 (ztd) (Entered: 04/23/2019)
2019-05-093ANSWER to 1 Complaint by DOJ.(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 05/09/2019)
2019-05-10MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by May 24, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/10/2019. (lccrc1) (Entered: 05/10/2019)
2019-05-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 5/24/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 05/10/2019)
2019-05-204SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM (Exhibits 15 and 16) to re 1 Complaint filed by DONATOS SARRAS. (ztd) (Entered: 05/23/2019)
2019-05-235STATUS REPORT by DOJ. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 05/23/2019)
2019-05-28MINUTE ORDER: In light of the government's 5 status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the government shall file a further status report by July 9, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/28/2019. (lccrc1) (Entered: 05/28/2019)
2019-05-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/9/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 05/29/2019)
2019-05-306NOTICE by DONATOS SARRAS (ztd) (Entered: 06/03/2019)
2019-06-037MOTION for Summary Judgment by DONATOS SARRAS (ztd) (Entered: 06/04/2019)
2019-06-068MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by DONATOS SARRAS (ztd). Added MOTION for Order on 6/11/2019 (ztd). (Entered: 06/11/2019)
2019-06-179ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION for Summary Judgment by DOJ (McBride, Patricia) Modified on 6/19/2019 (jf). (Entered: 06/17/2019)
2019-06-19NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment was entered in error at the request of counsel and will be refiled in the correct event. (jf) (Entered: 06/19/2019)
2019-06-1910Memorandum in opposition to re 8 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment MOTION for Order, 7 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DOJ. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 06/19/2019)
2019-07-0211REPLY to opposition to motion re 7 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DONATOS SARRAS. (ztd) (Entered: 07/03/2019)
2019-07-1212STATUS REPORT by DOJ. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 07/12/2019)
2019-07-25MINUTE ORDER striking as premature 7 Motion for Summary Judgment and 8 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Order. If necessary, the Court will set a briefing schedule for summary judgment after the government completes production. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/25/2019. (lccrc1) (Entered: 07/25/2019)
2019-07-25MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the government's 12 status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the government shall file a further status report by August 29, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/25/2019. (lccrc1) (Entered: 07/25/2019)
2019-07-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 8/29/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 07/25/2019)
2019-07-2613PROPOSED PRODUCTION SCHEDULE by DONATOS SARRAS. (tth) (Entered: 07/30/2019)
2019-07-2614MOTION to Compel by DONATOS SARRAS. (See Docket Entry 13 to view document). (tth) (Entered: 07/30/2019)
2019-07-31MINUTE ORDER denying 14 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and 13 Proposed Production Schedule. The Court has previously ordered the government to file a further status report by August 29, 2019. That status report will update the Court on the status of processing the approximately 400 pages of potentially responsive documents. The agency has previously represented that it expects to finish processing the potentially responsive documents and issue a response to Plaintiff by November 22, 2019. The Court will set a briefing schedule for summary judgment if necessary after the government completes production. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/31/2019. (lccrc1, ) (Entered: 07/31/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar