Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCenter For Biological Diversity v. Bureau of Land Management
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Jose
Case Number5:2019cv01611
Date Filed2019-03-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Nathanael M. Cousins
PlaintiffCenter For Biological Diversity
Case DescriptionThe Center for Biological Diversity submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning the resource management plan for the Southern Diablo Range and Central Coast of California and amendments to the plan allowing for gas and oil exploration. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Center for Biological Diversity filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Bureau of Land Management
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-281COMPLAINT against Bureau of Land Management ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13210604.). Filed byCenter For Biological Diversity. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lakewood, Clare) (Filed on 3/28/2019) (Entered: 03/28/2019)
2019-03-282Proposed Summons. (Lakewood, Clare) (Filed on 3/28/2019) (Entered: 03/28/2019)
2019-03-283Certificate of Interested Entities by Center For Biological Diversity re 1 Complaint (Lakewood, Clare) (Filed on 3/28/2019) (Entered: 03/28/2019)
2019-03-284Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/11/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2019) (Entered: 03/28/2019)
2019-03-285Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/19/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/26/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2019) (Entered: 03/28/2019)
2019-03-286Summons Issued as to U.S. Bureau of Land Management. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2019) (Entered: 03/28/2019)
2019-04-097*Filing Error* CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Center For Biological Diversity re 1 Complaint (Lakewood, Clare) (Filed on 4/9/2019) Modified on 4/10/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-04-098CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Center For Biological Diversity.. (Lakewood, Clare) (Filed on 4/9/2019) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-04-10Electronic filing error . Incorrect event used. [err101] **Re-File as Summons Returned Executed** Please re-file in its entirety. Re: 7 Certificate of Service filed by Center For Biological Diversity (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2019) (Entered: 04/10/2019)
2019-04-269SUMMONS Returned Executed (FOIA) by Center For Biological Diversity. U.S. Bureau of Land Management served on 4/3/2019, answer due 5/3/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Return Receipts/Proof of Delivery)(Lakewood, Clare) (Filed on 4/26/2019) (Entered: 04/26/2019)
2019-05-0310Federal Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint byU.S. Bureau of Land Management. (Pyle, Michael) (Filed on 5/3/2019) (Entered: 05/03/2019)
2019-05-0611CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 5/20/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2019) (Entered: 05/06/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar