Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00914
Date Filed2019-04-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted three FOIA requests to the Department of Justice for records concerning communications with outside parties pertaining to judicial nominations. AO also requested expedited processing for its first two requests because they were submitted during a Supreme Court vacancy. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and denied AO's requests for expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, AO filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-04-011COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6033124) filed by American Oversight. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 04/01/2019)
2019-04-012LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by American Oversight (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 04/01/2019)
2019-04-02Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zef, ) (Entered: 04/02/2019)
2019-04-023SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 04/02/2019)
2019-05-034RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/2/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/2/2019. (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 05/03/2019)
2019-05-085NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Matthew Snell on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Snell, Kevin) (Entered: 05/08/2019)
2019-05-086Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint Nunc Pro Tunc by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Snell, Kevin) (Entered: 05/08/2019)
2019-05-087ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - July 6, 2018 FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit B - July 9, 2018 FOIA Request, # 3 Exhibit C - July 24, 2018 FOIA Request, # 4 Exhibit D - July 16, 2018 Letter, # 5 Exhibit E - August 17, 2018 Letter)(Snell, Kevin) Modified on 5/9/2019 (ztd). (Entered: 05/08/2019)
2019-05-09NOTICE OF ERROR re 7 Answer to Complaint; emailed to kevin.snell@usdoj.gov, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. This should have been an attachment to your motion for leave to file. The court must grant leave to file. (ztd, ) (Entered: 05/09/2019)
2019-05-098Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint Nunc Pro Tunc by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Answer, # 3 Exhibit A to Answer - July 6, 2018 FOIA Request, # 4 Exhibit B to Answer - July 9, 2018 FOIA Request, # 5 Exhibit C to Answer - July 24, 2018 FOIA Request, # 6 Exhibit D to Answer - July 16, 2018 Letter, # 7 Exhibit E to Answer - August 17, 2018 Letter)(Snell, Kevin) (Entered: 05/09/2019)
2019-05-09MINUTE ORDER : Granting 8 Consent Motion for Extension of Deadlines. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by May 9, 2019. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/9/19. (DJS) (Entered: 05/09/2019)
2019-05-099ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Snell, Kevin) Modified filing date on 5/10/2019 (ztd). (Entered: 05/10/2019)
2019-05-0910ERRATA Filing of Exhibits to Answer by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE 9 Answer to Complaint filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Answer - July 6, 2018 FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit B to Answer - July 9, 2018 FOIA Request, # 3 Exhibit C to Answer - July 24, 2018 FOIA Request, # 4 Exhibit D to Answer - July 16, 2018 Letter, # 5 Exhibit E to Answer - August 17, 2018 Letter)(Snell, Kevin) Modified filing date on 5/10/2019 (ztd). (Entered: 05/10/2019)
2019-05-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 5/9/2019. (tb) (Entered: 05/10/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar