Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePHILLIPS v. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00928
Date Filed2019-04-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffJOSHUA PHILLIPS
Case DescriptionJoshua Phillips, an investigative reporter, submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security, the Department of Health and Human Services, the Department of Justice, the Department of State, and OMB for records concerning the treatment of alien minors in government detention centers. Phillips also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, Phillips filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantCUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
DefendantIMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DefendantCITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DefendantADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantOFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-04-021COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6037211) filed by Joshua Phillips. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons DHS, # 3 Summons CBP, # 4 Summons ICE, # 5 Summons CIS, # 6 Summons HHS, # 7 Summons ACF, # 8 Summons DOJ, # 9 Summons DOS, # 10 Summons OMB, # 11 Summons US Atty Gen, # 12 Summons USAO DC)(Kelly, Joseph) (Entered: 04/02/2019)
2019-04-03Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zsb) (Entered: 04/03/2019)
2019-04-032SUMMONS (11) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachmen: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 04/03/2019)
2019-05-133NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Todd Cohen on behalf of All Defendants (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 05/13/2019)
2019-05-134RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/16/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/16/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES served on 4/15/2019; CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 4/15/2019; CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION served on 4/15/2019; DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 4/18/2019; DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 4/15/2019; DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 4/16/2019; DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 5/10/2019; IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 4/15/2019; OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET served on 4/16/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/16/2019. (Kelly, Joseph) (Entered: 05/13/2019)
2019-05-145Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 05/14/2019)
2019-05-16MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 5 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the defendants shall respond to the plaintiff's Complaint on or before July 1, 2019. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on May 16, 2019. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 05/16/2019)
2019-05-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 7/1/2019, (hs) (Entered: 05/16/2019)
2019-06-24Case directly reassigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. Judge Reggie B. Walton is no longer assigned to the case. (rj) (Entered: 06/24/2019)
2019-07-016ANSWER to Complaint by ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET.(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 07/01/2019)
2019-08-13MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this Freedom of Information Act case are a Complaint and an Answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) appear to be inapplicable. It is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before September 12, 2019. The Joint Status Report shall address: (1) the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force , 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the Parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on August 13, 2019. (lccjn1) (Entered: 08/13/2019)
2019-08-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/12/2019. (mac) (Entered: 08/14/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar