Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCascade Forest Conservancy v. United States Forest Service et al
DistrictDistrict of Oregon
CityPortland
Case Number3:2019cv00481
Date Filed2019-04-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Michael W. Mosman
PlaintiffCascade Forest Conservancy a non-profit corporation
DefendantUnited States Forest Service an agency of the United States Government
DefendantUnited States Bureau of Land Management an agency of the United States Government
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-04-021Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5797074 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Cascade Forest Conservancy against All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons, # 3 Proposed Summons). (Buchele, Thomas) (Entered: 04/02/2019)
2019-04-022Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Cascade Forest Conservancy. (Buchele, Thomas) (Entered: 04/02/2019)
2019-04-023Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 7/31/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 8/30/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 8/30/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (ecp) (Entered: 04/02/2019)
2019-04-024Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (Attachments: # 1 issued summons) (ecp) (Entered: 04/02/2019)
2019-04-035Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Roger Flynn . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5797890. Filed by Cascade Forest Conservancy. (Buchele, Thomas) (Entered: 04/03/2019)
2019-04-056ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Roger Flynn for Cascade Forest Conservancy. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5797890 issued. Signed on 4/5/2019 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (sss) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
2019-04-057Notification of CM/ECF Account for Roger Flynn ( Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: rflynn . Go to the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (sss) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
2019-04-088Amended Proposed Summons (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Summons amended) Filed by Cascade Forest Conservancy. (Buchele, Thomas) (Main Document 8 replaced on 4/8/2019) (cw). (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/8/2019) (cw). (Entered: 04/08/2019)
2019-04-089Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction regarding 8 Proposed Summons. A corrected PDF has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachment (The original summons was not complete and was not flattened). The Notice of Electronic Filing will be regenerated to all parties. (cw) (Entered: 04/08/2019)
2019-04-0810Amended Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Forest Service. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp) (Entered: 04/08/2019)
2019-05-1311Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Odell, Stephen) (Entered: 05/13/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar