Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY v. U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00932
Date Filed2019-04-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Case DescriptionThe Center for Biological Diversity submitted three FOIA requests to U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service for records concerning the Interior Department's decision to discontinue FWS's earlier decision to ban the use of pesticides on Refuge System lands. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from agency concerning any of its requests, CBD filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-04-031COMPLAINT against U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6038154) filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Attorney General, # 3 Summons Fish and Wildlife, # 4 Summons US Attorney)(Connor, Hannah) (Entered: 04/03/2019)
2019-04-032LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Connor, Hannah) (Entered: 04/03/2019)
2019-04-03Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zef, ) (Entered: 04/03/2019)
2019-04-033SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 04/03/2019)
2019-04-114GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES APPLICABLE TO FOIA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for processing and production of records, batching motions, and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 4/11/2019. (lckbj1) (Entered: 04/11/2019)
2019-04-185RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/15/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/15/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Return Receipt)(Connor, Hannah) (Entered: 04/18/2019)
2019-04-186RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/15/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Return Receipt)(Connor, Hannah) (Entered: 04/18/2019)
2019-04-187RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE served on 4/15/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Return Receipt)(Connor, Hannah) (Entered: 04/18/2019)
2019-05-108NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Evan Kahn on behalf of U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Kahn, Matthew) (Entered: 05/10/2019)
2019-05-109AMENDED COMPLAINT against U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Redline Comparison)(Connor, Hannah) (Entered: 05/10/2019)
2019-05-1010NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret E. Townsend on behalf of CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 05/10/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar