Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleEQUITY FORWARD v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00942
Date Filed2019-04-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffEQUITY FORWARD
Case DescriptionEquity Forward submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Health and Human Services for records sent to or from Office of Refugee Resettlement director Scott Lloyd pertaining to pregnant unaccompanied minors. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told Equity Forward that it was being referred to the Administration for Children and Families for processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Equity Forward filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-04-031COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6038695) filed by EQUITY FORWARD. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 04/03/2019)
2019-04-032LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by EQUITY FORWARD (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 04/03/2019)
2019-04-04Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zef, ) (Entered: 04/04/2019)
2019-04-043SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 04/04/2019)
2019-04-174RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/5/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/5/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 4/8/2019 (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 04/17/2019)
2019-04-175MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Khahilia Y. Shaw, :Firm- American Oversight, :Address- 1030 15th Street NW, B-255, Washington, DC 20005. Phone No. - (202) 539-6507. Fax No. - (202) 871-6523 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6066635. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by EQUITY FORWARD (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 04/17/2019)
2019-04-18MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Khahilia Shaw is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/18/2019. (lctjk3) (Entered: 04/18/2019)
2019-04-186NOTICE of Appearance by Rhonda Lisa Campbell on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 04/18/2019)
2019-04-187MOTION for Extension of Time to by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 04/18/2019)
2019-04-22MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 7 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's 1 Complaint by May 20, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/22/2019. (lctjk3) (Entered: 04/22/2019)
2019-05-168RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/13/2019. (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 05/16/2019)
2019-05-209ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 05/20/2019)
2019-05-21MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by June 18, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 5/21/2019. (lctjk3) (Entered: 05/21/2019)
2019-06-1810Joint STATUS REPORT by EQUITY FORWARD. (Shaw, Khahilia) (Entered: 06/18/2019)
2019-06-19MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by August 1, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 6/19/2019. (lctjk3) (Entered: 06/19/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar