Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleADVANCEMENT PROJECT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00955
Date Filed2019-04-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffADVANCEMENT PROJECT
Case DescriptionThe Advancement Project submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, and U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records concerning traffic stops, checkpoints, or roving patrols conducted separately or together by CBP and ICE. The Advancement Project also requested a fee waiver. ICE acknowledged receipt of the request, but neither DHS nor CBP acknowledged receipt of the requests sent to them. After hearing nothing further from the agencies, the Advancement Project filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantU.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DefendantU.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-04-041COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6040669) filed by ADVANCEMENT PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Summons CBP, # 3 Summons Summons DHS, # 4 Summons Summons US AG, # 5 Summons Summons US Attorney DC, # 6 Summons Summons ICE)(Jimenez, Losmin) (Entered: 04/04/2019)
2019-04-05Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zsb) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
2019-04-052SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
2019-04-123RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/12/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/12/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Jimenez, Losmin) (Main Document 3 replaced on 4/15/2019) (ztth). (Entered: 04/12/2019)
2019-04-124RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/12/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Jimenez, Losmin) (Main Document 4 replaced on 4/16/2019) (ztth). (Entered: 04/12/2019)
2019-04-125RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION served on 4/11/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Jimenez, Losmin) (Main Document 5 replaced on 4/16/2019) (ztth). (Entered: 04/12/2019)
2019-04-126RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 4/11/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Jimenez, Losmin) (Main Document 6 replaced on 4/16/2019) (ztth). (Entered: 04/12/2019)
2019-04-127RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 4/11/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Jimenez, Losmin) (Main Document 7 replaced on 4/16/2019) (ztth). (Entered: 04/12/2019)
2019-04-16NOTICE OF ERROR re 7 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant; emailed to ljimenez@advancementproject.org, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. PLEASE DO NOT REFILE. Future documents must be in PDF format. (ztth, ) (Entered: 04/16/2019)
2019-05-138NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Field on behalf of All Defendants (Field, Brian) (Entered: 05/13/2019)
2019-05-139ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT.(Field, Brian) (Entered: 05/13/2019)
2019-05-14MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The status report should address the status of the plaintiff's FOIA request, including the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request, and the anticipated date(s) for release of the requested documents. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before June 14, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 14, 2019. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 05/14/2019)
2019-05-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/14/2019. (zcal) (Entered: 05/14/2019)
2019-06-0610Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Field, Brian) (Entered: 06/06/2019)
2019-06-06MINUTE ORDER granting the defendants' unopposed 10 Motion for Extension of Time. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file their Joint Status Report by June 20, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on June 6, 2019. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 06/06/2019)
2019-06-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/20/2019. (zcal) (Entered: 06/06/2019)
2019-06-2011Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 06/20/2019)
2019-06-21MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before July 19, 2019. Signed Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on June 21, 2019. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 06/21/2019)
2019-06-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/19/2019. (zcal) (Entered: 06/21/2019)
2019-07-1912Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 07/19/2019)
2019-07-19MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before August 19, 2019. Signed Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 19, 2019. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 07/19/2019)
2019-07-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/19/2019. (zcal) (Entered: 07/19/2019)
2019-08-1913Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 08/19/2019)
2019-08-19MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before September 19, 2019. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 19, 2019. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 08/19/2019)
2019-09-1914Joint STATUS REPORT by ADVANCEMENT PROJECT. (Jimenez, Losmin) (Entered: 09/19/2019)
2019-09-19MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before October 25, 2019. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 19, 2019. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 09/19/2019)
2019-09-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/25/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 09/19/2019)
2019-09-23ENTERED IN ERROR.....MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 30 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before November 22, 2019. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 23, 2019. (lcdlf3) Modified on 9/24/2019 - entered in incorrect case. (zcal). (Entered: 09/23/2019)
2019-09-24NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: MINUTE ORDER filed 9/23/2019 was entered in error. (zcal) (Entered: 09/24/2019)
2019-10-2515Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 10/25/2019)
2019-11-02MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before December 4, 2019. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 2, 2019. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 11/02/2019)
2019-12-0416Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 12/04/2019)
2019-12-04MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 16 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before January 8, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on December 4, 2019. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 12/04/2019)
2020-01-0817Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 01/08/2020)
2020-01-09MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 17 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before February 10, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 9, 2020. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 01/09/2020)
2020-02-1018Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 02/10/2020)
2020-02-11MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 18 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before March 10, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on February 11, 2020. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 02/11/2020)
2020-03-1019Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 03/10/2020)
2020-03-10MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 19 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before April 17, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 10, 2020. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 03/10/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar