Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00957
Date Filed2019-04-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
PlaintiffBUZZFEED INC.
Case DescriptionBuzzFeed reporter Jason Leopold submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for a copy of the Mueller report and supporting records. Leopold also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and granted Leopold's request for expedited processing. The Office of Information Policy told Leopold that it would take the agency longer than 10 days to disclose the records. After hearing nothing further, Leopold filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantDOJ OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL
DefendantDOJ DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL
DefendantDOJ OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-04-041COMPLAINT against DOJ DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6041154) filed by JASON LEOPOLD, BUZZFEED INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit B - DOJ Response, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/04/2019)
2019-04-042NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/04/2019)
2019-04-043NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Hart Burday on behalf of BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 04/04/2019)
2019-04-044LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BUZZFEED INC. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/04/2019)
2019-04-045MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Leopold Decl, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/04/2019)
2019-04-046MOTION to Expedite Plaintiff's Request for Expedited Preliminary Injunction Hearing , MOTION for Hearing re 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/04/2019)
2019-04-05Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zsb) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
2019-04-057SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to DOJ DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
2019-04-088RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/5/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/5/2019. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/08/2019)
2019-04-099Case reassigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton as there is an earlier related case. Judge Timothy J. Kelly is no longer assigned to the case. (rj) (Entered: 04/11/2019)
2019-04-1110ORDER. In accordance with the reasons stated in the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that the defendants shall file their opposition to the plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction on or before 12:00 p.m. on April 15, 2019. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiffs shall file their reply in support of their motion on or before 12:00 p.m. on April 16, 2019. It is further ORDERED that the 6 Plaintiffs' Request for Expedited Preliminary Injunction Hearing is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The motion is granted to the extent that the plaintiffs seek a hearing on their motion for a preliminary injunction. The motion is denied in all other respects. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall appear before the Court for a hearing on the Plaintiffs' Combined Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Memo in Support on April 16, 2019, at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 11, 2019. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 04/11/2019)
2019-04-1111ORDER. In accordance with the reasons stated in the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before April 19, 2019, the parties in the above-captioned matters shall SHOW CAUSE as to why the cases should not be consolidated. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 11, 2019. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 04/11/2019)
2019-04-1112NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney Danielle Enlow on behalf of All Defendants (Enlow, Courtney) (Entered: 04/11/2019)
2019-04-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses to Show Cause Order due by 4/19/2019. (hs) (Entered: 04/12/2019)
2019-04-12Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Response due by 4/15/2019 Reply due by 4/16/2019. Motion Hearing set for 4/16/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (hs) (Entered: 04/12/2019)
2019-04-1213RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by DOJ DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE re 11 Order, . (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Enlow, Courtney) (Entered: 04/12/2019)
2019-04-1214RESPONSE re 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by DOJ DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Index to Exhibits, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Enlow, Courtney) (Entered: 04/12/2019)
2019-04-1215MOTION to Vacate 10 Order on Motion to Expedite,,,, Order on Motion for Hearing,,, Motion to Vacate Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by DOJ DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Index to Exhibits, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Enlow, Courtney) (Entered: 04/12/2019)
2019-04-1516REPLY to opposition to motion re 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/15/2019)
2019-04-1617ORDER. In accordance with the reasons stated in the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that the Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and Defendants' Motion to Vacate Hearing is Denied, Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 16, 2019. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 04/16/2019)
2019-04-16Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Reggie B. Walton: Motion Hearing held on 4/16/2019 re 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD. Oral argument heard, and motion is DENIED for reasons stated on the record. Status conference remains scheduled for 5/2/19 @ 10am in case 19 cv 810. (Court Reporter: Lisa Edwards.) (tj) (Entered: 04/16/2019)
2019-04-1818ORDER. In accordance with the Court's oral rulings issued at the motion hearing held on April 16, 2019, it is hereby ORDERED that the 5 Plaintiffs' Combined Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Memo in Support is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Specifically, the motion is denied because the plaintiffs have not satisfied their burden of demonstrating that they have a substantial likelihood of success on the merits of their claim and that they face irreparable harm in the absence of an injunction. It is further ORDERED that the government shall file its answer to the plaintiffs' Complaint on or before April 25, 2019. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall appear before the Court on May 2, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. to discuss how the parties wish to proceed in this case. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 18, 2019. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 04/18/2019)
2019-04-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 4/25/2019, (hs) (Entered: 04/19/2019)
2019-04-19Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 5/2/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (hs) (Entered: 04/19/2019)
2019-04-1919NOTICE Plaintiffs' Position on Consolidation by BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/19/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar