Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThompson v. U.S. Justice Department
DistrictEastern District of Virginia
CityNewport News
Case Number4:2019cv00033
Date Filed2019-04-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen
PlaintiffDavid M. Thompson
Case DescriptionDavid Thompson submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice for records. After the agency failed to respond to any of his requests, Thompson filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantU.S. Justice Department
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-04-041COMPLAINT against U.S. Justice Department ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 44683010053.), filed by David M. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Receipt # 3 Proposed Summons) (epri, ). (Entered: 04/05/2019)
2019-04-052Two Summonses Issued as to U.S. Justice Department - via US Attorney and US Attorney General. Summons packages mailed to pro se plaintiff on 4.5.19. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, ) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
2019-04-163CERTIFICATE of Service re 1 Complaint, 2 Summons Issued by Virginia Lynn Van Valkenburg on behalf of U.S. Justice Department (Van Valkenburg, Virginia) (Entered: 04/16/2019)
2019-05-134ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. Justice Department. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit)(Van Valkenburg, Virginia) (Entered: 05/13/2019)
2019-05-15Referred for 16(b). (epri, ) (Entered: 05/15/2019)
2019-07-265RULE 26(f) PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for 8/19/2019 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk Courtroom 3. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 7/25/19 and filed on 7/26/19. Copy mailed to plaintiff on 7/26/19. (lhow) (Entered: 07/26/2019)
2019-07-266PARTIES' PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REPORT RE: PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by David M. Thompson. (epri, ) (Entered: 07/29/2019)
2019-07-297PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OR FOR VAUGHN INDEX by David M. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3, # 4 Attachment 4, # 5 Attachment 5, # 6 Attachment 6, # 7 Attachment 7, # 8 Attachment 8)(epri, ) (Entered: 07/30/2019)
2019-08-078MOTION for Protective Order and a Briefing Schedule by U.S. Justice Department. (Van Valkenburg, Virginia) (Entered: 08/07/2019)
2019-08-079Memorandum in Support re 8 MOTION for Protective Order and a Briefing Schedule filed by U.S. Justice Department. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Van Valkenburg, Virginia) (Entered: 08/07/2019)
2019-08-0710RESPONSE in Opposition re 7 MOTION to Compel filed by U.S. Justice Department. (Van Valkenburg, Virginia) (Entered: 08/07/2019)
2019-08-1311PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OR FOR VAUGHN INDEX, 7 , AND PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by David M. Thompson. (epri, ) (Entered: 08/14/2019)
2019-08-1312PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OR FOR VAUGHN INDEX AND PAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND PROTECTIVE ORDER, 8 . (Duplicate document to 11 ) filed by David M. Thompson. (epri, ) (Entered: 08/14/2019)
2019-08-1613REPLY to Response to Motion re 8 MOTION for Protective Order and a Briefing Schedule filed by U.S. Justice Department. (Van Valkenburg, Virginia) (Entered: 08/16/2019)
2019-09-0914Amended Complaint by David M. Thompson. (epri, ) (Entered: 09/10/2019)
2019-09-2315ANSWER to Complaint (Amended Complaint) by U.S. Justice Department. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit)(Van Valkenburg, Virginia) (Entered: 09/23/2019)
2020-01-1316NOTICE of Change of Address by David M. Thompson. : # 1 Envelope) (epri, ). (Entered: 01/13/2020)
2020-01-2417ORDER denying 7 Motion to Compel, and Defendant's Motion for Briefing Schedule and protective order, 8 is GRANTED. It is hereby ORDERED that: (i) Defendant shall file a Motion for Summary Judgment, along with a Vaughn index and any supporting affidavits, on or before March 2, 2020. (ii) Plaintiff shall file his opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on or before April 1, 2020. and (iii) Defendant shall file any intended reply on or before April 8, 2020. All discovery shall be stayed pending the resolution of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 1/24/20. (copy mailed 1/24/20) (afar) (Entered: 01/24/2020)
2020-01-3018NOTICE of Change of Phone number by David M. Thompson (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(epri, ) (Entered: 01/30/2020)
2020-02-0319Submission by David M. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(epri, ) (Entered: 02/03/2020)
2020-03-0220MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. Justice Department. (Van Valkenburg, Virginia) (Entered: 03/02/2020)
2020-03-0221Memorandum in Support re 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. Justice Department. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Exhibit 1, # 2 Affidavit Exhibit 2, # 3 Affidavit Exhibit 3)(Van Valkenburg, Virginia) (Entered: 03/02/2020)
2020-03-0222Roseboro Notice as to Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. Justice Department (Van Valkenburg, Virginia) (Entered: 03/02/2020)
2020-03-0223PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO FOIA UNTIMELINESS: REOUEST FOR DECLARATORY AND/OR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF by David M. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Attachments, # 2 Letter, # 3 Envelope)(epri, ) (Entered: 03/03/2020)
2020-03-1724RESPONSE in Opposition re 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. Justice Department. (Van Valkenburg, Virginia) (Entered: 03/17/2020)
2020-04-2725PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND TO DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by David M. Thompson. (epri, ) (Entered: 04/27/2020)
2020-04-2926REPLY to Response to Motion re 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. Justice Department. (Van Valkenburg, Virginia) (Entered: 04/29/2020)
2020-04-3027REPLY to Response to Motion re 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Amended - Exhibits Attached) filed by U.S. Justice Department. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Van Valkenburg, Virginia) (Entered: 04/30/2020)
2020-05-0428PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF HIS REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT by David M. Thompson (epri, ) (Entered: 05/04/2020)
2020-05-0729Response to 28 NOTICE filed by U.S. Justice Department. (Van Valkenburg, Virginia) (Entered: 05/07/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar