Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAmerican Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Animals v. The Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service et al
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2019cv03112
Date Filed2019-04-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Naomi Reice Buchwald
PlaintiffAmerican Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Animals
Case DescriptionThe American Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Animals submitted FOIA requests to the Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service for records concerning inspection photographs that were part of the Animal Care Information Search database. The agency acknowledged the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, ASPCA filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantThe Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service
DefendantThe United States Department of Agriculture
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [60]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-04-081COMPLAINT against The Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service, The United States Department of Agriculture. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16644863)Document filed by American Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Animals. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Correspondence)(Kennelly, Kaitland) (Entered: 04/08/2019)
2019-04-082CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kennelly, Kaitland) (Entered: 04/08/2019)
2019-04-083REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by American Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Animals. (Kennelly, Kaitland) (Entered: 04/08/2019)
2019-04-084REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The United States Department of Agriculture, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by American Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Animals. (Kennelly, Kaitland) (Entered: 04/08/2019)
2019-04-085RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by American Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Animals.(Kennelly, Kaitland) (Entered: 04/08/2019)
2019-04-09CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (pc) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-04-09Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (pc) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-04-09Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-04-096ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service. (pc) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-04-097ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The United States Department of Agriculture. (pc) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-04-158SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE). The Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service served on 4/10/2019, answer due 5/10/2019. Service was accepted by United States Attorney's Office. Document filed by American Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Animals. (Kennelly, Kaitland) (Entered: 04/15/2019)
2019-04-159SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE). The United States Department of Agriculture served on 4/10/2019, answer due 5/10/2019. Service was accepted by United States Attorney's Office. Document filed by American Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Animals. (Kennelly, Kaitland) (Entered: 04/15/2019)
2019-04-1510AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE). Service was made by Certified Mail. Document filed by American Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Animals. (Kennelly, Kaitland) (Entered: 04/15/2019)
2019-04-2311NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kaitland Mccann Kennelly on behalf of American Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Animals. (Kennelly, Kaitland) (Entered: 04/23/2019)
2019-05-0612NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer Helen Chin on behalf of American Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Animals. (Chin, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/06/2019)
2019-05-0613NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Natasha Waglow Teleanu on behalf of The Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service, The United States Department of Agriculture. (Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 05/06/2019)
2019-05-0714LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to the complaint addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Natasha W. Teleanu dated 5/7/2019. Document filed by The Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service, The United States Department of Agriculture.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 05/07/2019)
2019-05-0715MOTION for Erin M. Estevez to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16835541. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Animals. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Erin M. Estevez, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Virginia, # 3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - District of Columbia, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Estevez, Erin) (Entered: 05/07/2019)
2019-05-0716ORDER: granting 14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application Granted. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 5/07/2019) (ama) (Entered: 05/07/2019)
2019-05-07Set/Reset Deadlines: The Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service answer due 5/24/2019; The United States Department of Agriculture answer due 5/24/2019. (ama) (Entered: 05/07/2019)
2019-05-07>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 15 MOTION for Erin M. Estevez to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16835541. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma) (Entered: 05/07/2019)
2019-05-0817ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting 15 Motion for Erin M. Estevez to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 5/08/2019) (ama) (Entered: 05/08/2019)
2019-05-1418MOTION for Bonnie Weiss McLeod to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16878453. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Animals. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Bonnie Weiss McLeod, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Virginia, # 3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - District of Columbia, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Weiss McLeod, Bonnie) (Entered: 05/14/2019)
2019-05-14>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 18 MOTION for Bonnie Weiss McLeod to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16878453. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu) (Entered: 05/14/2019)
2019-05-1419ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting 18 Motion for Bonnie Weiss McLeod to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 5/14/2019) (ama) (Entered: 05/14/2019)
2019-05-2020LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Erin M. Estevez dated May 20, 2019. Document filed by American Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Animals.(Estevez, Erin) (Entered: 05/20/2019)
2019-05-2021ORDER granting 20 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 5/20/2019) (ks) (Entered: 05/21/2019)
2019-05-21Set/Reset Deadlines: The Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service answer due 7/1/2019; The United States Department of Agriculture answer due 7/1/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 5/31/2019. (ks) (Entered: 05/21/2019)
2019-05-3122AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint, against The Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service, The United States Department of Agriculture.Document filed by American Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Animals. Related document: 1 Complaint,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - ASPCA's correspondence with U.S. Attorney's office)(Estevez, Erin) (Entered: 05/31/2019)
2019-06-1423MOTION for Tamara Y. Feliciano to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17087364. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Animals. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Tamara Y. Feliciano, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Georgia, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Feliciano, Tamara) (Entered: 06/14/2019)
2019-06-14>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 23 MOTION for Tamara Y. Feliciano to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17087364. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc) (Entered: 06/14/2019)
2019-06-1824ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 23 Motion for Tamara Y. Feliciano to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 6/18/2019) (mro) (Entered: 06/19/2019)
2019-07-0125LETTER MOTION for Conference re: 22 Amended Complaint, and anticipated partial motion to dismiss addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Natasha W. Teleanu dated 7/1/2019. Document filed by The Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service, The United States Department of Agriculture.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 07/01/2019)
2019-07-0826LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Erin Estevez dated July 8, 2019 re: 25 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: 22 Amended Complaint, and anticipated partial motion to dismiss addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Natasha W. Teleanu dated 7/1/2019. . Document filed by American Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Animals. (Estevez, Erin) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-1827MOTION for Robert G. Hensley, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17269970. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Animals. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Robert G. Henlsey, Jr., # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - North Carolina, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Hensley, Robert) (Entered: 07/18/2019)
2019-07-18>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 27 MOTION for Robert G. Hensley, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17269970. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu) (Entered: 07/18/2019)
2019-07-1828ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting 27 Motion for Robert G. Hensley, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 7/18/2019) (ama) (Entered: 07/18/2019)
2019-07-25Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald: Telephone Conference held on 7/25/2019. (ade) (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-08-1229ANSWER to 22 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by The Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service, The United States Department of Agriculture.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 08/12/2019)
2019-09-0530JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Natasha W. Teleanu dated 9/5/2019 re: Status Update. Document filed by The Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service, The United States Department of Agriculture.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 09/05/2019)
2019-10-1131JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Natasha W. Teleanu dated 10/11/2019 re: status update. Document filed by The Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service, The United States Department of Agriculture.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 10/11/2019)
2019-10-1532MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: 31 Letter filed by The Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service, The United States Department of Agriculture. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 10/15/2019) (ama) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
2019-10-2533JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Natasha W. Teleanu dated 10/25/2019 re: status update and proposed briefing schedule. Document filed by The Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service, The United States Department of Agriculture.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 10/25/2019)
2019-10-2934MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: 33 Letter filed by The Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service, The United States Department of Agriculture. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED., ( Cross Motions due by 2/18/2020., Motions due by 1/16/2020., Responses due by 2/18/2020, Replies due by 3/16/2020.) (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 10/29/2019) (ama) (Entered: 10/29/2019)
2020-01-1335LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Natasha W. Teleanu dated 1/13/2020. Document filed by The Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service, The United States Department of Agriculture.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 01/13/2020)
2020-01-1636LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Erin M. Estevez dated January 16, 2020 re: 35 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Natasha W. Teleanu dated 1/13/2020. . Document filed by American Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Animals. (Estevez, Erin) (Entered: 01/16/2020)
2020-01-1637ORDER: granting 35 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The Court has reviewed the parties' letters dated January 13 and 16, 2020. Defendants' request for a stay until March 2, 2020 is granted. On that date, the parties shall apprise the Court of the remaining disputes between them, and, should any disputes remain, submit a revised proposed briefing schedule. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion pending at docket entry 35. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 1/16/2020) (ama) (Entered: 01/16/2020)
2020-01-16Case Stayed (ama) (Entered: 01/16/2020)
2020-03-0238LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Natasha W. Teleanu dated 3/2/2020 re: status update and proposed scheduling order. Document filed by The Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service, The United States Department of Agriculture..(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 03/02/2020)
2020-03-0339MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 38 Letter, filed by The Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service, The United States Department of Agriculture. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 4/20/2020., Responses due by 6/5/2020, Replies due by 6/19/2020.) (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 3/2/2020) (jca) (Entered: 03/03/2020)
2020-03-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motions due by 5/18/2020. (jca) (Entered: 03/04/2020)
2020-04-1640LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Natasha W. Teleanu dated 4/16/2020. Document filed by The Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service, The United States Department of Agriculture..(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 04/16/2020)
2020-04-1641ORDER granting 40 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 4/16/2020) (cf) (Entered: 04/16/2020)
2020-04-2042MOTION for Summary Judgment and Partial Judgment on the Pleadings . Document filed by The Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service, The United States Department of Agriculture..(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 04/20/2020)
2020-04-2043MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 42 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Partial Judgment on the Pleadings . . Document filed by The Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service, The United States Department of Agriculture..(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 04/20/2020)
2020-04-2044DECLARATION of Tonya G. Woods in Support re: 42 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Partial Judgment on the Pleadings .. Document filed by The Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service, The United States Department of Agriculture. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35, # 36 Exhibit 36, # 37 Exhibit 37, # 38 Exhibit 38, # 39 Exhibit 39, # 40 Exhibit 40, # 41 Exhibit 41, # 42 Exhibit 42, # 43 Exhibit 43, # 44 Exhibit 44, # 45 Exhibit 45, # 46 Exhibit 46, # 47 Exhibit 47).(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 04/20/2020)
2020-04-2045DECLARATION of Tonya G. Woods, Regarding Plaintiff's Policy and Practice Allegations in Support re: 42 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Partial Judgment on the Pleadings .. Document filed by The Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service, The United States Department of Agriculture..(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 04/20/2020)
2020-04-2046LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Natasha W. Teleanu dated 4/20/2020 re: outline of arguments in Defendants' motion for summary judgment and partial motion for judgment on the pleadings. Document filed by The Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service, The United States Department of Agriculture..(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 04/20/2020)
2020-05-1447LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Erin M. Estevez dated May 14, 2020. Document filed by American Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Animals..(Estevez, Erin) (Entered: 05/14/2020)
2020-05-1548ORDER: granting 47 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 5/15/2020) (ama) (Entered: 05/15/2020)
2020-05-1849CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by American Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Animals..(Estevez, Erin) (Entered: 05/18/2020)
2020-05-1850MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 42 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Partial Judgment on the Pleadings . and in Support of Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment 49 . Document filed by American Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Animals..(Estevez, Erin) (Entered: 05/18/2020)
2020-05-1851DECLARATION of Robert G. Hensley, Jr. in Support re: 49 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by American Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Animals. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Response to ASPCAs FOIA request, # 2 Exhibit 2 - USDA, Chief Freedom of Information Act Officer Report, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Memorandum, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Memorandum, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Updates to APHIS Website, # 6 Exhibit 6 - USDAs Report on the FOIA Request, # 7 Exhibit 7 - USDA, Chief Freedom of Information Act Officer Report, # 8 Exhibit 8 - Letter, # 9 Exhibit 9 - USDA Freedom of Information Act Annual Report, # 10 Exhibit 10 - USDA Freedom of Information Act Annual Report, # 11 Exhibit 11 - Letter, # 12 Exhibit 12 - Email, # 13 Exhibit 13 - Email, # 14 Exhibit 14 - Redacted Photo, # 15 Exhibit 15 - Applications for Licenses, # 16 Exhibit 16 - Applications for Licenses, # 17 Exhibit 17 - Email, # 18 Exhibit 18 - Letter, # 19 Exhibit 19 - Email Chain, # 20 Exhibit 20 - Email Chain, # 21 Exhibit 21 - Email, # 22 Exhibit 22 - Email Chain, # 23 Exhibit 23 - Email Chain, # 24 Exhibit 24 - Email Chain, # 25 Exhibit 25 - Redacted Attachments to Email, # 26 Exhibit 26 - Inspection Report, # 27 Exhibit 27 - Webpage & Search-generator, # 28 Exhibit 28 - USDA, Chief Freedom of Information Act Officer Report, # 29 Exhibit 29 - USDA, Freedom of Information Act Annual Report, # 30 Exhibit 30 - USDA, Freedom of Information Act Annual Report, # 31 Exhibit 31 - Letter, # 32 Exhibit 32 - Letter, # 33 Exhibit 33 - Letter, # 34 Exhibit 34 - Letter, # 35 Exhibit 35 - Email Chain, # 36 Exhibit 36 - Email Chain, # 37 Exhibit 37 - Email, # 38 Exhibit 38 - Email, # 39 Exhibit 39 - Email Chain).(Estevez, Erin) (Entered: 05/18/2020)
2020-05-1852RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by American Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Animals..(Estevez, Erin) (Entered: 05/18/2020)
2020-05-1853LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Erin M. Estevez dated May 18, 2020 re: Outline of Arguments Contained in Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by American Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Animals..(Estevez, Erin) (Entered: 05/18/2020)
2020-06-0554REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 49 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by The Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service, The United States Department of Agriculture..(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 06/05/2020)
2020-06-0555DECLARATION of Tonya G. Woods in Support re: 42 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Partial Judgment on the Pleadings .. Document filed by The Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service, The United States Department of Agriculture..(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 06/05/2020)
2020-06-0556COUNTER STATEMENT TO 52 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by The Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service, The United States Department of Agriculture..(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 06/05/2020)
2020-06-1757LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Erin M. Estevez dated June 17, 2020. Document filed by American Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Animals..(Estevez, Erin) (Entered: 06/17/2020)
2020-06-1858ORDER granting 57 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 6/18/2020) (rro) (Entered: 06/18/2020)
2020-06-1959REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 49 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by American Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Animals..(Estevez, Erin) (Entered: 06/19/2020)
2020-09-0260ORDER: The Court has determined that an ex parte, in camera inspection of unredacted copies of the records plaintiff challenges based on defendants' assertion of FOIA Exemption 5 will assist the Court's evaluation of the parties' cross-motions for summary judgment. See 5 U.S.C. § 552(a)(4)(B). Defendants shall file these unredacted records under seal and simultaneously mail two copies of the unredacted records to chambers. With respect to the records sent to chambers, defendants shall draw boxes with red outlines around the portions redacted pursuant to Exemption 5. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 9/2/2020) (tro) (Entered: 09/02/2020)
2020-09-0861***EX-PARTE***DECLARATION of Natasha W. Teleanu in Support re: 42 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Partial Judgment on the Pleadings .. Document filed by The Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service, The United States Department of Agriculture. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: 60 .(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 09/08/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar