Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAFGE LOCAL 520 v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00994
Date Filed2019-04-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffAFGE LOCAL 520
Case DescriptionLocal 520 of the American Federation of Government Employees, located in Columbia, South Carolina, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Veterans Affairs for records concerning production outages or interruptions at the Veterans Benefits Administration. After Local 520 contacted the agency to check on the status of its request, the agency acknowledged receipt of the request. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, Local 520 filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-04-091COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6049722) filed by AFGE LOCAL 520. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - FOIA requests, # 2 Exhibit B - Correspondence, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-04-092NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of AFGE LOCAL 520 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-04-11Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zef, ) (Entered: 04/11/2019)
2019-04-113SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 04/11/2019)
2019-04-124STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/12/2019. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 04/12/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar