Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFIX THE COURT v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01001
Date Filed2019-04-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffFIX THE COURT
Case DescriptionFix the Court submitted a FOIA request to the U.S. Marshals Service for records concerning the provision of security to Supreme Court Justices for out-of-town travel. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and provided Fix the Court with an estimated cost of $11,900 to process its request. Fix the Court filed an administrative appeal of the agency's decision not to grant it news media fee status. On appeal, the agency granted Fix the Court news media fee status and remanded the request for search. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, Fix the Court filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-04-101COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6050850) filed by FIX THE COURT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 7.1 Certificate, # 3 Summons DOJ, # 4 Summons US Att'y, # 5 Summons Att'y General)(Sobel, David) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/12/2019) (zef, ). (Entered: 04/10/2019)
2019-04-102LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FIX THE COURT. (zef, ) (Entered: 04/12/2019)
2019-04-12Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zef, ) (Entered: 04/12/2019)
2019-04-123SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 04/12/2019)
2019-04-124STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/12/19. (lctnm1) (Entered: 04/12/2019)
2019-05-065RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/22/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/22/2019. (Sobel, David) (Entered: 05/06/2019)
2019-05-066RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/22/2019. RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 4/22/2019. (See Docket Entry 5 to view document) (tth) (Entered: 05/07/2019)
2019-05-147Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/14/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar