Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBUZZFEED INC. v. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01006
Date Filed2019-04-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffBUZZFEED INC.
Case DescriptionBuzzFeed submitted FOIA requests to the FDA for records concerning various clinical trials. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, BuzzFeed filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-04-101COMPLAINT against FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6051563) filed by BUZZFEED INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit B - Acknoledgement, # 3 Exhibit C - FOIA Request, # 4 Exhibit D - Acknoledgement, # 5 Exhibit E - FOIA Request, # 6 Exhibit F - Acknowledgement, # 7 Exhibit G - FOIA Request, # 8 Exhibit H - Acknowledgement, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 10 Summons Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/10/2019)
2019-04-102NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of BUZZFEED INC. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/10/2019)
2019-04-103LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BUZZFEED INC. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/10/2019)
2019-04-104NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of BUZZFEED INC. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/10/2019)
2019-04-12Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zsb) (Entered: 04/12/2019)
2019-04-125SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zsb) (Entered: 04/12/2019)
2019-05-026NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Viggiano Valdivia on behalf of FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 05/02/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar