Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleACLU of Massachusetts v. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE)
DistrictDistrict of Massachusetts
CityBoston
Case Number1:2019cv10690
Date Filed2019-04-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Leo T. Sorokin
PlaintiffAmerican Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts, Inc.
Case DescriptionThe ACLU of Massachusetts submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning a speech made by ICE Associate Director for Enforcement and Removal Operations Matthew Albence to the Legislative Affairs Committee of the 2019 Winter Legislative and Technology Conference of the National Sheriffs' Association. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and took a 10-day extension in which to respond. After hearing nothing further from the agency, The ACLU of Massachusetts filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-04-101COMPLAINT against Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE) Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7630509 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by ACLU of Massachusetts. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Civil Category Sheet)(McFadden, Daniel) (Entered: 04/10/2019)
2019-04-102ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 04/10/2019)
2019-04-103NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Segal on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts, Inc. (Segal, Matthew) (Entered: 04/10/2019)
2019-04-104Summons Issued as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 04/10/2019)
2019-04-265SUMMONS Returned Executed U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 4/12/2019, answer due 5/3/2019. (McFadden, Daniel) (Entered: 04/26/2019)
2019-04-266AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts, Inc.. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 4/11/2019, answer due 5/3/2019. Acknowledgement filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts, Inc.. (McFadden, Daniel) (Entered: 04/26/2019)
2019-05-137ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Poswistilo, Susan) (Entered: 05/13/2019)
2019-05-148NOTICE of Scheduling Conference; A Scheduling Conference has been set for 6/12/2019 03:00 PM in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Attachments: # 1 scheduling order sample, # 2 standing order re summary judgment)(Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 05/14/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar