Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCatholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc. et al v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
DistrictDistrict of Maryland
CityGreenbelt
Case Number8:2019cv01074
Date Filed2019-04-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Peter J. Messitte
PlaintiffCatholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc.
PlaintiffAsylum Seeker Advocacy Project, Urban Justice Center
Case DescriptionThe Catholic Legal Immigration Network and the Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project submitted FOIA requests to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning the Alien Files for Ena Dalila Mendez Mendez and her minor daughter Wilmer Elic Martinez Mendez. The groups also requested expedited processing. The agency denied the request for Ena Mendez's Alien file because CLIA and ASAP had not provided proof that Mendez had provided her permission for disclosure. The groups filed an administrative appeal of that decision. The agency then denied the groups' request for Wilmer Mendez's Alien File for the same reason. The agency also denied the groups' request for expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, CLIA and ASAP filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-04-101COMPLAINT against United States Citizenship and Immigration Services ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7943340.), filed by Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc. and Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project, Urban Justice Center. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/11/2019)
2019-04-11Case Assigned to Judge Peter J. Messitte. (ko, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/11/2019)
2019-04-122QC NOTICE: 1 Complaint, filed by Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc. and Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project, Urban Justice Center was filed with the following attachments missing - Proposed Summons. To correct this problem, file Proposed Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Proposed Summons to 1 Complaint. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/12/2019)
2019-04-123NOTICE by Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project, Urban Justice Center, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(Mendez, Michelle) (Entered: 04/12/2019)
2019-04-124Summons Issued 60 days as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/12/2019)
2019-04-165MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Katherine Lewis (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7954242.) by Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project, Urban Justice Center, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc.(Mendez, Michelle) (Entered: 04/16/2019)
2019-04-166MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Elizabeth Willis (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7954382.) by Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project, Urban Justice Center, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc.(Mendez, Michelle) (Entered: 04/16/2019)
2019-04-187QC NOTICE: 5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project, Urban Justice Center needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srds, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/18/2019)
2019-04-188QC NOTICE: 6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project, Urban Justice Center needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srds, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/18/2019)
2019-04-259CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Katherine Lewis by Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project, Urban Justice Center, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Signature Page). The fee has already been paid.(Mendez, Michelle) (Entered: 04/25/2019)
2019-04-2510CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Elizabeth Willis by Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project, Urban Justice Center, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Signature Page). The fee has already been paid.(Mendez, Michelle) (Entered: 04/25/2019)
2019-04-2911PAPERLESS ORDER granting 9 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Katherine Lewis. Directing attorney Katherine Lewis to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 4/29/2019. (srds, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/29/2019)
2019-05-0112PAPERLESS ORDER granting 10 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Elizabeth Willis. Directing attorney Elizabeth Willis to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 5/1/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/01/2019)
2019-05-0313AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project, Urban Justice Center. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Redline Version)(Mendez, Michelle) (Entered: 05/03/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar