Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNATIONAL PUBLIC RADIO, INC. et al v. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01018
Date Filed2019-04-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffNATIONAL PUBLIC RADIO, INC.
PlaintiffSEAN MCMINN
Case DescriptionSean McMinn, a data editor for National Public Radio, submitted a FOIA request to OMB for records concerning all-staff emails sent by OMB Director Mick Mulvaney from March 2017 to March 2018. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, NPR filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantOFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-04-111COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief for Violation of the Freedom of Information Act against OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6054434) filed by NATIONAL PUBLIC RADIO, INC., SEAN MCMINN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons Ofc of Mgmt and Budget, # 5 Summons US Atty General, # 6 Summons US Atty for DC)(Zycherman, Lisa) (Entered: 04/11/2019)
2019-04-12Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zsb) (Entered: 04/12/2019)
2019-04-122SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 04/12/2019)
2019-04-183RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET served on 4/16/2019 (Zycherman, Lisa) Modified on 4/19/2019 to correct serve date (jf). (Entered: 04/18/2019)
2019-04-184RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/15/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/15/2019. (Zycherman, Lisa) Modified on 4/19/2019 to correct docket serve/answer due date (jf). (Entered: 04/18/2019)
2019-04-185RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/15/19. (Zycherman, Lisa) Modified on 4/19/2019 to correct serve date (jf). (Entered: 04/18/2019)
2019-04-306MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Thomas R. Burke, :Firm- Davis Wright Tremaine LLP, :Address- 505 Montgomery Street, Suite 800, San Francisco, California 94111-6533. Phone No. - (415) 276-6500. Fax No. - (415) 276-6599 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6090775. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SEAN MCMINN, NATIONAL PUBLIC RADIO, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of T. Burke, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Zycherman, Lisa) (Entered: 04/30/2019)
2019-05-017ORDER granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/1/2019. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 05/01/2019)
2019-05-038NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas R. Burke on behalf of SEAN MCMINN, NATIONAL PUBLIC RADIO, INC. (Burke, Thomas) (Entered: 05/03/2019)
2019-05-089NOTICE of Appearance by Chelsea Kelly on behalf of SEAN MCMINN, NATIONAL PUBLIC RADIO, INC. (Kelly, Chelsea) (Entered: 05/08/2019)
2019-05-1510Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 05/15/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar