Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWHITE COAT WASTE PROJECT v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01019
Date Filed2019-04-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffWHITE COAT WASTE PROJECT
Case DescriptionWhite Coat Waste Project submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Veterans Affairs for records concerning the agency's use of dogs in experimentation and research. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. WCW contacted the agency to check on the status of its request and was told the agency had 40 complex requests in its queue ahead of the WCW request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, WCW filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
810 Vermont Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20420
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-04-111COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6054500) filed by WHITE COAT WASTE PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to Department of Veterans Affairs, # 3 Summons for USAG, # 4 Summons for USAO of DDC)(Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 04/11/2019)
2019-04-112LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WHITE COAT WASTE PROJECT (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 04/11/2019)
2019-04-12Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zsb) (Entered: 04/12/2019)
2019-04-123SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 04/12/2019)
2019-04-254NOTICE of Appearance by April Denise Seabrook on behalf of All Defendants (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 04/25/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar