Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCAMPAIGN LEGAL CENTER v. UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01020
Date Filed2019-04-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffCAMPAIGN LEGAL CENTER
Case DescriptionThe Campaign Legal Center submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning the agency's attempts to get voter registration data from the State of North Carolina. CLC also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and subsequently confirmed that it was being processed. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, CLC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-04-111COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6055448) filed by CAMPAIGN LEGAL CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Moshe Pasternak, # 2 Exhibit A Through L, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons As to Attorney General, # 5 Summons As to ICE, # 6 Summons As to U.S. Attorney)(Noti, Adav) (Entered: 04/11/2019)
2019-04-112LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CAMPAIGN LEGAL CENTER (Noti, Adav) (Entered: 04/11/2019)
2019-04-113NOTICE of Appearance by Adav Noti on behalf of CAMPAIGN LEGAL CENTER (Noti, Adav) (Entered: 04/11/2019)
2019-04-12Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zsb) (Entered: 04/12/2019)
2019-04-124SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 04/12/2019)
2019-04-265NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle M. Lang on behalf of CAMPAIGN LEGAL CENTER (Lang, Danielle) (Entered: 04/26/2019)
2019-04-266MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jonathan Diaz, :Firm- Campaign Legal Center, :Address- 1101 14th St. NW, Ste. 400, Washington, DC 20005. Phone No. - 202-736-2200. Fax No. - 202-736-2222 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6084316. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CAMPAIGN LEGAL CENTER (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Jonathan Diaz, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lang, Danielle) (Entered: 04/26/2019)
2019-05-01MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Jonathan Diaz is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 5/1/2019. (lcapm2) (Entered: 05/01/2019)
2019-05-167NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Leeson Sroka on behalf of All Defendants (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 05/16/2019)
2019-05-168ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT.(Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 05/16/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar