Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDoe v. Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictWestern District of Michigan
CitySouthern Division
Case Number1:2019cv00288
Date Filed2019-04-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Paul L. Maloney
PlaintiffJohn Doe
Case DescriptionJohn Doe, an applicant for asylum from Africa, submitted a FOIA request through his attorney to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records about himself. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Doe filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDepartment of Homeland Security
DefendantUnited States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-04-161COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by John Doe (Asch, Marc) (Entered: 04/16/2019)
2019-04-16FILING FEE PAID re 1 by plaintiff John Doe in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4414251 (Asch, Marc) (Entered: 04/16/2019)
2019-04-162MOTION for leave to appear and proceed using a pseudonym by plaintiff John Doe; (Asch, Marc) (Entered: 04/16/2019)
2019-04-163PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re 1 (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Letter to Deputy Clerk re proposed summons) (Asch, Marc) (Entered: 04/16/2019)
2019-04-174NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (clw) (Entered: 04/17/2019)
2019-04-175SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (clw) (Entered: 04/17/2019)
2019-04-186CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff John Doe re MOTION for leave to appear and proceed using a pseudonym 2 (Asch, Marc) (Entered: 04/18/2019)
2019-04-267SUMMONS returned executed on Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, US Attorney and US Attorney General; served on 4/22/2019, answer due 6/21/2019 (Asch, Marc) Modified text on 4/30/2019 per 7 (clw). (Entered: 04/26/2019)
2019-04-298NOTICE to attorney Marc A. Asch regarding recent filing 7 (kw) (Entered: 04/29/2019)
2019-04-299EXHIBIT re 7 by plaintiff John Doe (Asch, Marc) (Entered: 04/29/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar