Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAsian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DistrictNorthern District of California
CityOakland
Case Number4:2019cv02091
Date Filed2019-04-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore
PlaintiffAsian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus
Case DescriptionAsian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning the repatriation of Laotian nationals who had been ordered removed from the United States. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told AAAJ that it would invoke a 10-day extension to respond. AAAJ then requested expedited processing. Although the agency told AAAJ that it was processing the request, after hearing nothing further from the agency, AAAJ filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Vaughn index, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-04-171COMPLAINT against Immigration and Customs Enforcement ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13269527.). Filed byNossaman LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hon, Willis) (Filed on 4/17/2019) (Entered: 04/17/2019)
2019-04-172Proposed Summons. (Hon, Willis) (Filed on 4/17/2019) (Entered: 04/17/2019)
2019-04-173Certificate of Interested Entities by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus (Hon, Willis) (Filed on 4/17/2019) (Entered: 04/17/2019)
2019-04-174Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/1/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2019) (Entered: 04/17/2019)
2019-04-175Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/23/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/30/2019 01:30 PM. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2019) (Entered: 04/18/2019)
2019-04-18Electronic filing error . The Defendant's name on the proposed summons must match the Defendant's name on the Complaint EXACTLY Please re-file the proposed summons in its entirety. Re: 2 Proposed Summons. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2019) (Entered: 04/18/2019)
2019-04-186Proposed Summons. (Hon, Willis) (Filed on 4/18/2019) (Entered: 04/18/2019)
2019-04-187Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2019) (Entered: 04/18/2019)
2019-04-228CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus re 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, 7 Summons Issued as to USA, 4 Case Assigned by Intake,,, 1 Complaint, 3 Certificate of Interested Entities (Hon, Willis) (Filed on 4/22/2019) (Entered: 04/22/2019)
2019-04-249CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus.. (Hon, Willis) (Filed on 4/24/2019) (Entered: 04/24/2019)
2019-04-2510CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus re 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, 7 Summons Issued as to USA, 1 Complaint, 3 Certificate of Interested Entities (Hon, Willis) (Filed on 4/25/2019) (Entered: 04/25/2019)
2019-05-1511STIPULATION re 1 Complaint Stipulation to Respond to Complaint filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Molinari, Gioconda) (Filed on 5/15/2019) (Entered: 05/15/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar