Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNATIONAL LEGAL AND POLICY CENTER v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01086
Date Filed2019-04-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge John D. Bates
PlaintiffNATIONAL LEGAL AND POLICY CENTER
Case DescriptionThe National Legal and Policy Center submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning the appointment of Robert Mueller to be special counsel. NLPC also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but denied NLPC's request for expedited processing. NLPC filed an administrative appeal of the denial of expedited processing. The Justice Management Division responded to the parts of NLPC's request for records concerning the agency's ethics review but withheld a two-page memo under Exemption 5 (privileges). NLPC filed an administrative appeal challenging the Exemption 5 claims. After hearing nothing further from the agency, NLPC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-04-171COMPLAINT against NATIONAL LEGAL AND POLICY CENTER v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6066793) filed by NATIONAL LEGAL AND POLICY CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Kamenar, Paul) (Entered: 04/17/2019)
2019-04-19Case Assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (zef, ) (Entered: 04/19/2019)
2019-04-192SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 04/19/2019)
2019-04-233REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE US ATTORNEY re 1 Complaint, filed by NATIONAL LEGAL AND POLICY CENTER. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by NATIONAL LEGAL AND POLICY CENTER.(Kamenar, Paul) (Entered: 04/23/2019)
2019-04-244SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney (ztd) (Entered: 04/24/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar