Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY v. U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01159
Date Filed2019-04-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Case DescriptionThe Center for Biological Diversity submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service for records concerning border walls or barriers. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, CBD filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-04-231COMPLAINT against U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6075268) filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Center for Biological Diversity, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney for D.C., # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 5 Summons U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service)(Su, Anchun) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/23/2019) (zef, ). (Entered: 04/23/2019)
2019-04-232LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (zef, ) (Entered: 04/23/2019)
2019-04-23Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zef, ) (Entered: 04/23/2019)
2019-04-233ENTERED IN ERROR.....SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) Modified on 4/29/2019 (zef, ). (Entered: 04/23/2019)
2019-04-254NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Wakefield Wolf on behalf of CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Wolf, Douglas) (Entered: 04/25/2019)
2019-04-265CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY . (Wolf, Douglas) (Entered: 04/26/2019)
2019-04-29NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile FOIA type summons. (zef, ) (Entered: 04/29/2019)
2019-04-296REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE as to U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney for D.C., and U.S. Attorney General [Corrected FOIA type summons] re 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. Related document: 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA.(Su, Anchun) (Entered: 04/29/2019)
2019-05-017SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (tth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/1/2019: # 1 Notice and Consent) (ztth). Modified on 5/1/2019 to correct summons date issued (zrdj). (Entered: 05/01/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar