Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJimenez et al v. Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictSouthern District of Florida
CityMiami
Case Number1:2019cv21546
Date Filed2019-04-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Darrin P. Gayles
PlaintiffIvan Jimenez
PlaintiffJuan Machado
PlaintiffJose Munoz
PlaintiffGuillermo Sencion
PlaintiffMiguel Vasquez
Case DescriptionIvan Jimenez, Juan Machado, Josi Munoz, Guillermo Sencion, and Miguel Vasquez submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security for records from the Office of Biometric Identity Management about themselves. They also filed requests with the Department of State for records about themselves. After hearing nothing further from either agency, Jimenez and the others filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDepartment of Homeland Security
DefendantDepartment of State
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-04-231COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11580435, filed by Guillermo Sencion, Ivan Jimenez, Jose Munoz, Juan Machado, Miguel Vasquez. (Attachments: # 1 Summon(s) DHS, # 2 Summon(s) DOS, # 3 Summon(s) AG, # 4 Summon(s) USA-SDFL, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Knopf, Andrew) (Entered: 04/23/2019)
2019-04-232Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs) (Entered: 04/23/2019)
2019-04-233Summons Issued as to Department of State, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (pcs) (Entered: 04/23/2019)
2019-04-234Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. Summons NOT issued for the following reason - Incomplete Address for Department of Homeland Security. (pcs) (Entered: 04/23/2019)
2019-04-235NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (isc) (Entered: 04/23/2019)
2019-04-246Summons Issued as to Department of Homeland Security (pcs) (Entered: 04/24/2019)
2019-04-267MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for KellyMcClanahan. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11590697 by Ivan Jimenez, Juan Machado, Jose Munoz, Guillermo Sencion, Miguel Vasquez. Responses due by 5/10/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion for PHV)(Knopf, Andrew) (Entered: 04/26/2019)
2019-04-298ENDORSED ORDER granting 7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Kelly McClanahan is permitted to appear before this Court on behalf of Plaintiffs for all purposes relating to this action. The clerk is directed to provide Notice of Electronic Filings to Mr. McClanahan at Kel@NationalSecurityLaw.org. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (isc) (Entered: 04/29/2019)
2019-05-099ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to 1 Complaint, filed by Ivan Jimenez, Juan Machado, Jose Munoz, Guillermo Sencion, Miguel Vasquez. (Knopf, Andrew) (Entered: 05/09/2019)
2019-05-0910NOTICE of Striking 9 Acknowledgment of Service filed by Jose Munoz, Guillermo Sencion, Ivan Jimenez, Miguel Vasquez, Juan Machado by Ivan Jimenez, Juan Machado, Jose Munoz, Guillermo Sencion, Miguel Vasquez (Knopf, Andrew) (Entered: 05/09/2019)
2019-05-0911SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Guillermo Sencion, Ivan Jimenez, Jose Munoz, Juan Machado, Miguel Vasquez. Department of Homeland Security served on 5/3/2019, answer due 7/2/2019; Department of State served on 5/3/2019, answer due 7/2/2019. (Knopf, Andrew) (Entered: 05/09/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar