Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAmerican Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts et al v. Department of Homeland Security
DistrictDistrict of Massachusetts
CityBoston
Case Number1:2019cv10916
Date Filed2019-04-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Nathaniel M. Gorton
PlaintiffAmerican Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts
PlaintiffAmerican Oversight
Case DescriptionThe ACLU of Massachusetts and American Oversight submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning a border security plan submitted to Congress. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the ACLU of Massachusetts and American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDepartment of Homeland Security
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-04-231COMPLAINT against Department of Homeland Security Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7650653 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts, American Oversight. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Civil Category Sheet)(McFadden, Daniel) (Entered: 04/23/2019)
2019-04-232CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts. (McFadden, Daniel) (Entered: 04/23/2019)
2019-04-233ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 04/23/2019)
2019-04-234Summons Issued as to Department of Homeland Security. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Caruso, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/23/2019)
2019-04-235NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine M. Anthony on behalf of American Oversight (Anthony, Katherine) (Entered: 04/23/2019)
2019-04-236CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Oversight. (Anthony, Katherine) (Entered: 04/23/2019)
2019-04-237NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Segal on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts (Segal, Matthew) (Entered: 04/23/2019)
2019-05-028SUMMONS Returned Executed Department of Homeland Security served on 4/24/2019, answer due 5/15/2019. (McFadden, Daniel) (Entered: 05/02/2019)
2019-05-069AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by American Oversight. Acknowledgement filed by American Oversight. (Anthony, Katherine) (Entered: 05/06/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar