Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFRANK LLP v. CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01197
Date Filed2019-04-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffFRANK LLP
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Frank LLP submitted a FOIA request to the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau for records concerning the agency's findings as reflected in its complaint filed against the National Collegiate Student Loan Trust. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency denied the request under Exemption 4 (confidential business information), Exemption 7(A) (interference with ongoing investigation or proceeding), and Exemption 7(E) (investigative methods and techniques). Frank LLP filed an administrative appeal of the denial. The agency upheld its original denial on the basis of Exemption 7(A) and 7(E). Frank LLP then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-04-241COMPLAINT against CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6080697) filed by FRANK LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons CFPB, # 7 Summons US AG, # 8 Summons US Atty - DC)(Frank, Gregory) (Entered: 04/24/2019)
2019-04-242LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FRANK LLP (Frank, Gregory) (Entered: 04/24/2019)
2019-04-25Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zef, ) (Entered: 04/25/2019)
2019-04-253SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 04/25/2019)
2019-05-074ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Filing of Proof of Service by FRANK LLP (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit s of Process Server Chad Haltom, # 2 Exhibit Reflecting Certified Mailings per FRCP 4(i))(Frank, Gregory) Modified on 5/8/2019 (zjf). (Entered: 05/07/2019)
2019-05-08NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re 4 Notice (Other) was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading using the "Service of Process" event. (jf) (Entered: 05/08/2019)
2019-05-085RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU served on 4/25/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/25/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/25/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/25/2019.) (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit s of Process Server Chad Haltom, # 2 Exhibit Reflecting Certified Mailings per FRCP 4(i))(Frank, Gregory) (Entered: 05/08/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar