Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleStone v. United States Department of Justice
DistrictNorthern District of Texas
CityDallas
Case Number3:2019cv00985
Date Filed2019-04-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ed Kinkeade
PlaintiffGerald Stone
Case DescriptionGerald Stone submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning the Community Housing Fund. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency told Stone that it found no responsive records. Stone filed an administrative appeal of that decision. The agency acknowledged receipt of the appeal and upheld its initial decision. Stone then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-04-241New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Rutherford (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the national and circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ajb) (Entered: 04/24/2019)
2019-04-242Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (ajb) (Entered: 04/24/2019)
2019-04-243COMPLAINT against United States Department of Justice filed by Gerald Stone. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number DS115712) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (ajb) (Entered: 04/24/2019)
2019-04-244CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gerald Stone. (ajb) (Entered: 04/24/2019)
2019-04-245Summons issued as to United States Department of Justice, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (ajb) (Entered: 04/24/2019)
2019-05-076MOTION Issue summons filed by Gerald Stone (Attachments: # 1 Additional Page(s) Summonses) (Stone, Gerald) (Entered: 05/07/2019)
2019-05-087ORDER denying 6 Motion to Use Plaintiff-Prepared Summons. Plaintiff may not serve Defendant himself. If Plaintiff does not properly serve Defendant within 90 days after Plaintiff filed his complaint, this case is subject to dismissal without prejudice. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 5/8/2019) (zkc) (Entered: 05/08/2019)
2019-05-088REPLY filed by Gerald Stone re: 7 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, (Stone, Gerald) (Entered: 05/08/2019)
2019-05-099Summons Reissued as to United States Department of Justice, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (zkc) (Entered: 05/09/2019)
2019-05-1510CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gerald Stone (Attachments: # 1 Additional Page(s) Certified receipts) (Stone, Gerald) (Entered: 05/15/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar