Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFLIPPIN v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01221
Date Filed2019-04-25
Date Closed2019-05-08
JudgeUnassigned
PlaintiffAMEER FLIPPIN
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR
DefendantU.S. PARK POLICE DEPARTMENT
DefendantU.S. CAPITOL POLICE DEPARTMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [4]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-04-25Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 4/25/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zrdj) (Entered: 04/30/2019)
2019-04-251COMPLAINT against U.S. CAPITOL POLICE DEPARTMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, U.S. PARK POLICE DEPARTMENT filed by AMEER FLIPPIN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(zrdj) (Entered: 04/30/2019)
2019-04-252MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by AMEER FLIPPIN (zrdj) (Entered: 04/30/2019)
2019-04-253NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by AMEER FLIPPIN. Case related to Case No. 19mc19. (zrdj) (Entered: 04/30/2019)
2019-05-084MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/7/2019. (zrdj) (Entered: 05/09/2019)
2019-05-085ORDER DISMISSING PRO SE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Ordered that the 2 application of the plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. This is a final appealable Order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/7/2019. (zrdj) (Entered: 05/09/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar