Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAlliance for the Wild Rockies v. U.S. Fish & Wildlife Service
DistrictDistrict of Montana
CityMissoula
Case Number9:2019cv00080
Date Filed2019-05-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Donald W. Molloy
PlaintiffAlliance for the Wild Rockies
Case DescriptionAlliance for the Wild Rockies submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service for records concerning biological opinions and take statements for several projects. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and took a 10-day extension. After hearing heard nothing further from the agency, Alliance for the Wild Rockies filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Fish & Wildlife Service agency within the U.S. Department of Interior
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Opinion/Order [3]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-011COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief filed by Alliance for the Wild Rockies. (Attachments: # 1 Ex 1 - FOIA Request, # 2 Ex 2 - Tracking Number, # 3 Ex 3 - Letter, # 4 civil cover sheet) (ASG) (Entered: 05/01/2019)
2019-05-012Summonses Issued. Originals mailed to Counsel Smith. (ASG) (Entered: 05/01/2019)
2019-05-01Filing fee: $400.00 paid, receipt number 0977-2302837 (ASG) (Entered: 05/01/2019)
2019-05-083ORDER: Proposed case management plan due on or before August 9, 2019. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 5/8/2019. (ASG) (Entered: 05/08/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar