Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01279
Date Filed2019-05-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
PlaintiffBUZZFEED, INC.
Case DescriptionBuzzFeed reporter Jason Leopold submitted FOIA requests to various components of the Department of Justice for records concerning communications pertaining to the Mueller report. Leopold also requested expedited processing. The agency denied Leopold's request for expedited processing and told him that his requests qualified for the unusual circumstances exception. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Leopold filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantDOJ OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL
DefendantDOJ DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL
DefendantDOJ OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DefendantDOJ NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION
DefendantDOJ OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL
DefendantDOJ OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL
DefendantOFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-021COMPLAINT against DOJ DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, DOJ OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, DOJ OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL, DOJ OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6097965) filed by BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 05/02/2019)
2019-05-03Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zef, ) (Entered: 05/03/2019)
2019-05-032SUMMONS (11) Issued Electronically as to DOJ DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, DOJ OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, DOJ OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL, DOJ OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 05/03/2019)
2019-06-103Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by DOJ DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, DOJ OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, DOJ OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL, DOJ OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/10/2019)
2019-06-10MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' 3 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED, for good cause shown, that Defendants' motion is GRANTED. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' 1 Complaint no later than July 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 6/10/2019. (lctjk2) (Entered: 06/10/2019)
2019-06-134RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DOJ DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL served on 5/15/2019 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-06-135RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DOJ NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION served on 5/15/2019 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-06-136RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DOJ OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL served on 5/15/2019 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-06-137RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DOJ OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL served on 5/15/2019 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-06-138RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DOJ OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL served on 5/15/2019 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-06-139RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DOJ OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL served on 5/15/2019 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-06-1310RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 5/15/2019 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-06-1311RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE served on 5/15/2019 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-06-1312RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/15/2019. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-06-1313RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/15/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/14/2019. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-06-1314RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 5/15/2019 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-07-1515ANSWER to Complaint by DOJ DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, DOJ OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, DOJ OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL, DOJ OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1, # 2 Exhibit A-2, # 3 Exhibit B-1, # 4 Exhibit B-2, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O, # 18 Exhibit P, # 19 Exhibit Q, # 20 Exhibit R, # 21 Exhibit S, # 22 Exhibit T, # 23 Exhibit U, # 24 Exhibit V, # 25 Exhibit W, # 26 Exhibit X, # 27 Exhibit Y, # 28 Exhibit Z, # 29 Exhibit AA, # 30 Exhibit BB, # 31 Exhibit CC, # 32 Exhibit DD, # 33 Exhibit EE, # 34 Exhibit FF, # 35 Exhibit GG, # 36 Exhibit HH, # 37 Exhibit II, # 38 Exhibit JJ, # 39 Exhibit KK, # 40 Exhibit LL, # 41 Exhibit MM, # 42 Exhibit NN, # 43 Exhibit OO, # 44 Exhibit PP, # 45 Exhibit QQ, # 46 Exhibit RR, # 47 Exhibit SS, # 48 Exhibit TT, # 49 Exhibit UU, # 50 Exhibit VV, # 51 Exhibit WW, # 52 Exhibit XX, # 53 Exhibit YY, # 54 Exhibit ZZ, # 55 Exhibit AAA, # 56 Exhibit BBB, # 57 Exhibit CCC, # 58 Exhibit DDD, # 59 Exhibit EEE)(Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/15/2019)
2019-07-16MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure no later than August 5, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/16/2019. (lctjk2) (Entered: 07/16/2019)
2019-08-0516Joint STATUS REPORT on Behalf of the Parties by DOJ DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, DOJ OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, DOJ OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL, DOJ OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/05/2019)
2019-08-05MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 16 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, no later than October 16, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 8/5/2019. (lctjk2) (Entered: 08/05/2019)
2019-08-0617NOTICE of Appearance by Merrick Jason Wayne on behalf of BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 08/06/2019)
2019-10-1618Joint STATUS REPORT on behalf of the Parties by DOJ DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, DOJ OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, DOJ OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL, DOJ OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/16/2019)
2019-10-17MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 18 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, no later than December 20, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/17/19. (lctjk2) (Entered: 10/17/2019)
2019-12-1719Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by DOJ DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, DOJ OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, DOJ OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL, DOJ OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/17/2019)
2019-12-17MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' 19 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report. It is hereby ORDERED, for good cause shown, that Defendants' 19 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report is GRANTED. The parties shall file their joint status report no later than December 24, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/17/19. (lctjk2) (Entered: 12/17/2019)
2019-12-2320Joint STATUS REPORT on behalf of the Parties by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/23/2019)
2020-01-02MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 20 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, no later than March 31, 2020. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 1/2/20. (lctjk2) (Entered: 01/02/2020)
2020-03-3121Joint STATUS REPORT on Behalf of the Parties by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/31/2020)
2020-03-31MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 21 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, no later than June 30, 2020. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 3/31/20. (lctjk2) (Entered: 03/31/2020)
2020-06-3022Joint STATUS REPORT on behalf of the Parties by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/30/2020)
2020-07-01MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 22 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, no later than September 10, 2020. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/1/20. (lctjk2) (Entered: 07/01/2020)
2020-09-1023Joint STATUS REPORT on behalf of the Parties by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/10/2020)
2020-09-11MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 23 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, no later than November 6, 2020. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/11/20. (lctjk2) (Entered: 09/11/2020)
2020-10-0824WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO 29 NOTICE.....Emergency MOTION for Order by BUZZFEED, INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Topic, Matthew) Modified on 10/26/2020 (zrdj). (Entered: 10/08/2020)
2020-10-08MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file any response to the Plaintiffs' 24 Emergency MOTION no later than October 16, 2020, and Plaintiffs shall file any reply no later than October 20, 2020. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/08/20. (lctjk2) (Entered: 10/08/2020)
2020-10-1625RESPONSE re 24 Emergency MOTION for Order on behalf of all Defendants filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/16/2020)
2020-10-2026NOTICE of Filing of Declaration in Related Matter by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/20/2020)
2020-10-2027REPLY to opposition to motion re 24 Emergency MOTION for Order filed by BUZZFEED, INC., JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/20/2020)
2020-10-2128NOTICE of Ruling in Related Case by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/21/2020)
2020-10-2329NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by BUZZFEED, INC., JASON LEOPOLD re 24 Emergency MOTION for Order (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/23/2020)
2020-11-0630Joint STATUS REPORT on behalf of the Parties by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/06/2020)
2020-11-07MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 30 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, no later than January 15, 2021. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/7/20. (lctjk2) (Entered: 11/07/2020)
2021-01-1531Joint STATUS REPORT on behalf of the Parties by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/15/2021)
2021-01-19MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 31 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, no later than March 16, 2021. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 1/19/21. (lctjk2) (Entered: 01/19/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar