Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGULLEY v. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01283
Date Filed2019-05-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffRICHARD GULLEY
Case DescriptionRichard Gulley submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Army for records concerning Inspector General investigations within the past five years addressing allegations that the Army improperly withheld pay or entitlements for Reserve component members. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Gulley filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES ARMY
1500 Defense Pentagon
Washington, DC 20310
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-021COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6099346) filed by RICHARD GULLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Hughes, Patrick) (Entered: 05/02/2019)
2019-05-03Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zef, ) (Entered: 05/03/2019)
2019-05-032ENTERED IN ERROR.....SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) Modified on 5/3/2019 (zef, ). (Entered: 05/03/2019)
2019-05-03NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile Summons for FOIA Nature of Suit cases. (zef, ) (Entered: 05/03/2019)
2019-05-03SUMMONS Not Issued as to DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY. (zef, ) (Entered: 05/03/2019)
2019-05-063REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by RICHARD GULLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(Hughes, Patrick) (Entered: 05/06/2019)
2019-05-084SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf) (Entered: 05/08/2019)
2019-05-105STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 05/10/19. (Attachment: Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 05/10/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar