Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleOliver B Mitchell III v. Lydie L Hazan et al
DistrictCentral District of California
CityWestern Division - Los Angeles
Case Number2:2019cv03608
Date Filed2019-04-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Philip S. Gutierrez
PlaintiffOliver B Mitchell, III
Case DescriptionOliver Mitchell submitted a request for records to Axis Clinical Trials for records concerning a clinical trial on syphilis in which he participated. After the company failed to respond, Mitchell filed suit against Axis Clinical Trials and Dr. Lydie Hazan. This is not a FOIA claim.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantLydie L Hazan M.D.
DefendantAxis Clinical Trials
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-04-301COMPLAINT against Defendants Axis Clinical Trials, Lydie L Hazan. Case assigned to Judge Philip S. Gutierrez for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth, filed by plaintiff Oliver B Mitchell, III. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 30 Days Summon not issue). (jp) (Entered: 05/02/2019)
2019-04-302CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Oliver B Mitchell, III. (jp) (Entered: 05/02/2019)
2019-04-303REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis With Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Oliver B Mitchell, III. (jp) (Entered: 05/02/2019)
2019-04-304NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (jp) (Entered: 05/02/2019)
2019-04-305NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jp) (Entered: 05/02/2019)
2019-05-026ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth: granting 3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (sbou) (Entered: 05/03/2019)
2019-05-03730 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), 1 as to Defendants Axis Clinical Trials, Lydie L Hazan. (sbou) (Entered: 05/06/2019)
2019-05-078STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji) (Entered: 05/07/2019)
2019-05-149MINUTE ORDER (In Chambers): Order to Show Cause why the case should not be dismissed by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Accordingly, Plaintiff is ORDERED to show cause in writing no later than May 31, 2019 why this case should not be dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). Failure to respond as ordered will result in the case being dismissed. (see document for further details) (bm) (Entered: 05/14/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar