Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01300
Date Filed2019-05-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Labor and the Department of Justice for records concerning communications with Steve Wynn Resorts, whose businesses had been impacted by changes in polices pertaining to tip-pooling. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from either agency, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-061COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6104531) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons to U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons to U.S. Department of Labor, # 5 Summons to U.S. Department of Justice)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 05/06/2019)
2019-05-062LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 05/06/2019)
2019-05-07Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zef, ) (Entered: 05/07/2019)
2019-05-073SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 05/07/2019)
2019-05-144STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 05/14/19. (Attachment: Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 05/14/2019)
2019-05-145MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Katherine M. Anthony, :Firm- American Oversight, :Address- 1030 15th St. NW, B255, Washington, DC 20005. Phone No. - (202) 897-3918. Fax No. - (202) 871-6523 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6123154. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Katherine M. Anthony, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 05/14/2019)
2019-05-14MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court hereby grants attorney Katherine M. Anthony pro hac vice admission to this Court pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 5/14/2019. (lcegs3) (Entered: 05/14/2019)
2019-05-156NOTICE of Appearance by April Denise Seabrook on behalf of All Defendants (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 05/15/2019)
2019-05-297RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/8/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/7/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/13/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR served on 5/13/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Clay M. Goode)(Anthony, Katherine) (Entered: 05/29/2019)
2019-06-03MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff brings this action pursuant to the Freedom of Information Act ("FOIA"), 5 U.S.C. § 552. The parties are directed to meet and confer and propose a joint scheduling order for further proceedings in this case by no later than June 14, 2019. The parties' joint proposed scheduling order shall address the following: (1) The status of plaintiff's FOIA requests; (2) The anticipated number of documents responsive to plaintiff's FOIA requests; (3) The anticipated date(s) for release of documents responsive to plaintiff's FOIA requests; (4) Whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case; (5) Whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case; (6) Whether this case would benefit from referral to a magistrate judge or the District Court Mediation Program for purposes of settlement; and (7) A proposed briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if applicable. If the parties are unable to agree on a joint recommendation, the joint proposed scheduling order shall include each party's individual recommendations. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 6/3/2019. (lcegs3) (Entered: 06/03/2019)
2019-06-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Scheduling Order due by 6/14/2019. (mac) (Entered: 06/03/2019)
2019-06-038RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 6/3/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Clay M. Goode)(Anthony, Katherine) (Entered: 06/03/2019)
2019-06-079UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(zrdj) (Entered: 06/10/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar