Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION v. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01308
Date Filed2019-05-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffWILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION
Case DescriptionThe Wild Horse Freedom Federation submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for communications sent to or from Sally Spencer, Supervisory Marketing Specialist for the agency's Wild Horse and Burro Program. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Wild Horse Freedom Federation filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-061COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6106062) filed by WILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 05/06/2019)
2019-05-08Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zef, ) (Entered: 05/08/2019)
2019-05-082SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 05/08/2019)
2019-05-213NOTICE of Appearance by Rhonda Lisa Campbell on behalf of BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 05/21/2019)
2019-05-314Joint MOTION to Stay the Case by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 05/31/2019)
2019-05-31MINUTE ORDER: Denying without prejudice 4 Joint Motion to Stay for failing to comply with Local Civil Rule 7(c). Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/31/19. (DJS) (Entered: 05/31/2019)
2019-05-315ERRATA Proposed Order by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT 4 Joint MOTION to Stay the Case filed by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 05/31/2019)
2019-05-316STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (ztd); (See docket entry no. 4 to view.) (Entered: 06/03/2019)
2019-06-057NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Terrell Malone on behalf of WILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION (Malone, Sean) (Entered: 06/05/2019)
2019-06-11MINUTE ORDER: Joint Status Report and proposed order due August 1, 2019. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 6/11/19. (DJS) (Entered: 06/11/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar