Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY v. U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01317
Date Filed2019-05-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Case DescriptionThe Center for Biological Diversity submitted a FOIA request to the EPA for records concerning communications between EPA and the National Marine Fisheries Service mentioning EPA's development and implementation of an effectiveness monitoring plan pertaining to the use of pesticides containing chlorpyrifos, diazinon, and malathion. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, CBD filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-071COMPLAINT against U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6106656) filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons United States Attorney, # 3 Summons Attorney General, # 4 Summons Environmental Protection Agency)(Connor, Hannah) (Entered: 05/07/2019)
2019-05-072LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Connor, Hannah) (Entered: 05/07/2019)
2019-05-073MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jonathan Carter Evans, :Firm- Center for Biological Diversity, :Address- 1212 Broadway, Suite 800, Oakland, CA 94612. Phone No. - 510-844-7118. Fax No. - n/a Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6106741. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jonathan Evans, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Connor, Hannah) (Entered: 05/07/2019)
2019-05-08Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zef, ) (Entered: 05/08/2019)
2019-05-084SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 05/08/2019)
2019-05-09MINUTE ORDER granting 3 Plaintiff's Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Jonathan Carter Evans is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/09/2019. (lcapm1) (Entered: 05/09/2019)
2019-05-105NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Evans on behalf of CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Evans, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/10/2019)
2019-05-246RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/17/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/16/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Return Receipt)(Connor, Hannah) (Entered: 05/24/2019)
2019-05-247RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 5/16/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Return Receipt)(Connor, Hannah) (Entered: 05/24/2019)
2019-05-248RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/17/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Return Receipt)(Connor, Hannah) (Entered: 05/24/2019)
2019-06-119Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Truong, John) (Entered: 06/11/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar