Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS UNITED v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01327
Date Filed2019-05-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffCITIZENS UNITED
Case DescriptionCitizens United submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Treasury for records concerning emails sent to or from senior agency officials and five named individuals, including Hunter Biden, son of Joe Biden. Citizens United also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and denied Citizens United's request for expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Citizens United filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-071COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6108168) filed by CITIZENS UNITED. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Summons to AG, # 5 Summons to Treasury, # 6 Summons to USA)(Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 05/07/2019)
2019-05-072LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS UNITED (Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 05/07/2019)
2019-05-08Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zrdj) (Entered: 05/08/2019)
2019-05-083SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj) (Entered: 05/08/2019)
2019-05-154STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 05/15/19. (Attachment: Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 05/15/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar