Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleS.P. PLAZA, LC v. U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01336
Date Filed2019-05-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffS.P. PLAZA, LC
Case DescriptionS.P. Plaza, L.C. submitted a FOIA request to the General Services Administration for records concerning the construction of the federal courthouse in McAllen, Texas. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told S.P. Plaza that processing its request would incur fees. S.P. Plaza reminded GSA that it could not charge fees if it did not respond within the statutory time limits. After hearing nothing further from the agency, S.P. Plaza filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-071COMPLAINT against U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6109937) filed by S.P. PLAZA, LC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 4)(Himes, Lisa) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/8/2019) (zef, ). (Entered: 05/07/2019)
2019-05-072LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by S.P. PLAZA, LC (Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 05/07/2019)
2019-05-08Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zef, ) (Entered: 05/08/2019)
2019-05-083SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Main Document 3 replaced on 5/8/2019 to add summons with case number; Additional NEF was generated ) (zef, ). (Entered: 05/08/2019)
2019-05-094ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 05/09/19. (DM) (Entered: 05/09/2019)
2019-05-145RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/9/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/8/2019. (Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 05/14/2019)
2019-05-146RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/09/2019. (Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 05/14/2019)
2019-05-147RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION served on 5/9/2019 (Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 05/14/2019)
2019-05-158NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 05/15/2019)
2019-06-109ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION.(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 06/10/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar