Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSTATE OF NEW JERSEY v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of New Jersey
CityTrenton
Case Number3:2019cv12218
Date Filed2019-05-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Michael A. Shipp
PlaintiffSTATE OF NEW JERSEY
Case DescriptionThe State of New Jersey submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning the agency's interpretation of the Wire Act. The State of New Jersey also asked for a fee waiver. DOJ acknowledged receipt of the request and told the State of New Jersey that it would invoke a 10-day extension in which to respond. After hearing nothing further the agency, the State of New Jersey filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-071COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Filing and Admin fee $ 400 TRE102120), filed by STATE OF NEW JERSEY.(MORAMARCO, GLENN) Modified on 5/7/2019 to add receipt number (jjc, ). (Entered: 05/07/2019)
2019-05-072Request for Summons to be Issued by STATE OF NEW JERSEY as to All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MORAMARCO, GLENN) (Entered: 05/07/2019)
2019-05-07Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (kas, ) (Entered: 05/07/2019)
2019-05-073SUMMONS ISSUED as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (kas, ) (Entered: 05/07/2019)
2019-05-134NOTICE of Intervention by Harold P. Kupersmit. (jem) (Entered: 05/13/2019)
2019-06-065Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney STEVEN ANDREW MYERS for UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE added. (MYERS, STEVEN) (Entered: 06/06/2019)
2019-06-06Clerk`s Text Order - The document 5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/28/2019. (jem) (Entered: 06/06/2019)
2019-06-076CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STATE OF NEW JERSEY , AFFIDAVIT of Service for complaint served on U.S. Dept. of Justice; William Barr; and USAO DNJ on May 8, 2019, filed by STATE OF NEW JERSEY. (MORAMARCO, GLENN) (Entered: 06/07/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar