Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMcBride v. Department of Veterans Affairs et al
DistrictDistrict of New Mexico
CityAlbuquerque
Case Number1:2019cv00423
Date Filed2019-05-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Scott W. Skavdahl
PlaintiffEdward McBride
Case DescriptionEdward McBride submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Veterans Affairs for records concerning an incident in which he was detained by the Santa Fe police. After hearing nothing further from the agency, McBride filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDepartment of Veterans Affairs
DefendantJared Howard Director of the Santa Fe National Cemetery
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-081COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Jared Howard, Veterans Affairs, Department of ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Edward T. McBride. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Dunn, A.) (Entered: 05/08/2019)
2019-05-08Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6421647 re 1 Complaint filed by Edward T. McBride (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Dunn, A.) (Entered: 05/08/2019)
2019-05-08District Judge Scott W. Skavdahl and Magistrate Judge Mark L. Carman assigned. (mnb) (Entered: 05/08/2019)
2019-05-09Summons Issued as to Department of Veterans Affairs and Jared Howard. (mnb) (Entered: 05/09/2019)
2019-05-162SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edward McBride. All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Dunn, A.) (Entered: 05/16/2019)
2019-05-163AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Edward McBride. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Dunn, A.) (Entered: 05/16/2019)
2019-06-064ANSWER to 3 Amended Complaint by Department of Veterans Affairs, Jared Howard. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Documents produced, # 2 Exhibit Documents produced, # 3 Exhibit Documents produced, # 4 Exhibit Documents produced, # 5 Exhibit Documents produced, # 6 Exhibit Documents produced)(Lucero, Manuel) (Entered: 06/06/2019)
2019-06-075NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 7/18/2019 at 3:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Mark L. Carman. (gr) (Entered: 06/07/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar