Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRivera v. National Nuclear Security Administration et al
DistrictNorthern District of California
CityOakland
Case Number4:2019cv02515
Date Filed2019-05-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore
PlaintiffAnthony Rivera
Case DescriptionAnthony Rivera, a former employee at the Lawrence Livermore National Laboratory, submitted FOIA requests to the National Nuclear Security Administration for records concerning his whistleblowing claims against LLNL and the costs of the litigation. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Rivera filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNational Nuclear Security Administration
DefendantUS Department of Energy
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-091COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13335509.). Filed by Anthony Rivera. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Yundt, Scott) (Filed on 5/9/2019) Modified on 5/13/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/23/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/09/2019)
2019-05-102Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/24/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2019) (Entered: 05/10/2019)
2019-05-133Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/6/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/13/2019 01:30 PM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2019) (Entered: 05/13/2019)
2019-05-234***DISREGARD. SEE DOCKET #5.*** Proposed Summons. (Yundt, Scott) (Filed on 5/23/2019) Modified on 5/24/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/23/2019)
2019-05-235Proposed Summons. (Yundt, Scott) (Filed on 5/23/2019) (Entered: 05/23/2019)
2019-05-236CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Anthony Rivera.. (Yundt, Scott) (Filed on 5/23/2019) (Entered: 05/23/2019)
2019-05-247Summons Issued as to National Nuclear Security Administration, US Department of Energy, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2019) (Entered: 05/24/2019)
2019-05-308CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Anthony Rivera (Yundt, Scott) (Filed on 5/30/2019) (Entered: 05/30/2019)
2019-05-30Electronic filing error . No title Page. Certificates/Proofs of Service e-filed separately and not as an attachment, require a title page. Please refer to Civil Local Rules 3-4 re first page requirement. Document not properly linked. [err102] Please re-file in its entirety. Re: 8 Certificate of Service filed by Anthony Rivera (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2019) (Entered: 05/30/2019)
2019-06-129CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Anthony Rivera (Yundt, Scott) (Filed on 6/12/2019) (Entered: 06/12/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar