Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC CITIZEN v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01383
Date Filed2019-05-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffPUBLIC CITIZEN
Case DescriptionPublic Citizen submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Education for records concerning the agency's Internet usage policy. Public Citizen also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and granted Public Citizen's request for a fee waiver. The agency responded to Public Citizen's request by providing a link on its website to its web usage policies. Public Citizen filed an administrative appeal, arguing that the records were not responsive to its request concerning Internet usage not related to the agency's website. The agency acknowledged receipt of the appeal, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Public Citizen filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-141COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6121956) filed by PUBLIC CITIZEN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 4 Summons Dept of Education)(Joshi, Nandan) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/16/2019) (zef, ). (Entered: 05/14/2019)
2019-05-142LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC CITIZEN (Joshi, Nandan) (Entered: 05/14/2019)
2019-05-16Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zef, ) (Entered: 05/16/2019)
2019-05-163SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 05/16/2019)
2019-05-164NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick D. Llewellyn on behalf of PUBLIC CITIZEN (Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 05/16/2019)
2019-05-165RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/16/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/15/2019. (Joshi, Nandan) (Entered: 05/16/2019)
2019-06-136MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION (Truong, John) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-06-147Memorandum in opposition to re 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by PUBLIC CITIZEN. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Joshi, Nandan) (Entered: 06/14/2019)
2019-06-14MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant's answer shall be due by July 12, 2019. Defendant has established good cause for the additional time based on the need to consult with agency counsel. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 6/14/2019. (lcapm2) (Entered: 06/14/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar