Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION et al v. UNITED STATES COAST GUARD
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01388
Date Filed2019-05-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffAMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
PlaintiffAMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionThe ACLU submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Coast Guard for records concerning logbooks or logbook entries related to the detention of suspected drug traffickers maintained by officers onboard Coast Guard cutters in the Eastern Caribbean. The ACLU also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told the ACLU that its request had been forwarded to the Office of Investigations for processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the ACLU filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES COAST GUARD
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-141COMPLAINT against DEFENDANT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6123631) filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Hafetz, Jonathan) Modified text on 5/16/2019 (zeg). (Entered: 05/14/2019)
2019-05-142LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION (Hafetz, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/14/2019)
2019-05-16Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zeg) (Entered: 05/16/2019)
2019-05-163SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 05/16/2019)
2019-05-164NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur B. Spitzer on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Spitzer, Arthur) (Entered: 05/16/2019)
2019-06-065GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES APPLICABLE TO FOIA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for processing and production of records, batching motions, and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 6/6/2019. (lckbj1) (Entered: 06/06/2019)
2019-06-066NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Boyd Palmer-Ball on behalf of UNITED STATES COAST GUARD (Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 06/06/2019)
2019-06-077MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Steven M. Watt. , :Firm- American Civil Liberties Union, :Address- 125 Broad Street Suite 18. Phone No. - 212-549-2500. Fax No. - 212-549-2654 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6172492. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Hafetz, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/07/2019)
2019-06-10MINUTE ORDER. Pending before this Court is a motion seeking pro hac vice admission of Steven M. Watt in this matter. (See ECF No. 7 .) The declaration attached to this motion omits the information required by LCvR 83.2(d)(5). Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file an errata attaching an updated declaration from Attorney Watt on or before 6/24/2019. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 6/10/2019. (lckbj1) (Entered: 06/10/2019)
2019-06-118RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. All Plaintiffs (Spitzer, Arthur) (Entered: 06/11/2019)
2019-06-119RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/24/2019. (Spitzer, Arthur) (Entered: 06/11/2019)
2019-06-1110RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/28/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/27/2019. (Spitzer, Arthur) (Entered: 06/11/2019)
2019-06-1211ERRATA by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION. (Hafetz, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/12/2019)
2019-06-12MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that Steven M. Watt is admitted pro hac vice in this matter as counsel for Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 6/12/2019. (lckbj1) (Entered: 06/12/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar