Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEGACY FOUNDATION v. FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01389
Date Filed2019-05-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffLEGACY FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionThe Legacy Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Federal Election Commission for records concerning communications between Commissioner Weintraub or her staff and CREW, the Campaign Legal Center, or Mother Jones. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. In response to queries from the Legacy Foundation, the agency told LF that is was processing the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the Legacy Foundation filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-141COMPLAINT against FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6122835) filed by The Legacy Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Appendix Appendix A, # 6 Appendix Appendix B)(Torchinsky, Jason) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/16/2019) (zef, ). (Entered: 05/14/2019)
2019-05-142LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by The Legacy Foundation (Torchinsky, Jason) (Main Document 2 replaced on 5/16/2019) (zef, ). (Entered: 05/14/2019)
2019-05-16Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zef, ) (Entered: 05/16/2019)
2019-05-163SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 05/16/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar