Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCui v. Federal Bureau of Investigation
DistrictEastern District of New York
CityBrooklyn
Case Number1:2019cv02904
Date Filed2019-05-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Margo K. Brodie
PlaintiffJizi Cui
PlaintiffShoumei Kan
PlaintiffFengzhe Jin
Case DescriptionJizi Cui submitted FOIA requests to the FBI for records concerning its investigation of human trafficking. The agency denied his requests. Cui filed administrative appeals of his denials, which were denied as well. He then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation Headquarters Office
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-161COMPLAINT against Jizi Cui, Shoumei Kan, Fengzhe Jin, Federal Bureau of Investigation Headquarters Office filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11487952 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Jizi Cui. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons) (Worontzoff, Daniel) (Entered: 05/16/2019)
2019-05-20Case Assigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our website . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/20/2019)
2019-05-202In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/20/2019)
2019-05-203This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/20/2019)
2019-05-204Summons Issued as to Federal Bureau of Investigation Headquarters Office. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/20/2019)
2019-05-235SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shoumei Kan, Jizi Cui, Fengzhe Jin. Federal Bureau of Investigation Headquarters Office served on 5/22/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Worontzoff, Daniel) (Entered: 05/23/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar