Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSNARR v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01421
Date Filed2019-05-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffMARK ISSAC SNARR
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-14Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 05/14/2019. (zsb) (Entered: 05/22/2019)
2019-05-141COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS filed by MARK ISSAC SNARR. (Attachment: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(zsb) (Entered: 05/22/2019)
2019-05-142MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MARK ISSAC SNARR (zsb) (Entered: 05/22/2019)
2019-05-143NOTICE of Appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.2(g) by Nathan Phelps on behalf of MARK ISSAC SNARR (zsb) (Entered: 05/22/2019)
2019-06-074FIAT ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. "Leave to file without prepayment of costs GRANTED." Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 06/07/2019. (zmc) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-06-135Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zmc) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar